EP3334205 - TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOMAKURA Kazunari c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
AIBA Tatsushi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16833081.9 | 03.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016JP72825 | Priority number, date | JP20150155578 | 06.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015155578 | [2018/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017022802 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3334205 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W72/10, H04L5/00, // H04L5/14 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H04L5/0032 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/10 (CN,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0082 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/1263 (CN);
H04W72/1273 (CN,US);
H04W72/21 (CN);
H04W72/54 (CN);
H04W72/569 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W72/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG | [2018/24] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2018/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2018 | Translation filed | 31.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 31.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/16] | Divisional application(s) | EP20154963.1 / EP3668164 | EP22191224.9 / EP4117218 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2456154 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]WO2012111992 (PANTECH CO LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]EP2658155 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]EP2785102 (SHARP KK [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2015035832 (SHARP KK); | [Y]US2015207604 (SUN JINGYUAN [CN], et al) |