EP3333651 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, In-Sik c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
BANG, Yong-Seok C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Mi-Ri C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/06] |
Former [2018/24] | 01 /
CHUNG, In-Sik C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
BANG, Yong-Seok C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Mi-Ri C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16835311.8 | 11.07.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016KR07498 | Priority number, date | KR20150111860 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: KR 20150111860 | [2018/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017026670 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333651 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G04G21/00, G04G17/04, G04G17/08, G04B19/16 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G04G21/00 (EP,US);
G04B19/16 (EP,US);
G04G17/04 (EP,US);
G04G17/08 (EP,US);
G04G21/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/24] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2018/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2018 | Translation filed | 06.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 06.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002101457 (LANG ERIC G [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 4-7; | [XA]WO2004012178 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 7, line 22 * * page 9, line 24 - page 11, line 22 * * figures 1,2,10,11 *[A] 4-7; | [XA]KR100685218B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,4,5 * [A] 8 | International search | [A]US2004113819 (GAUTHEY DARRYL [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * See abstract, paragraphs [0024]-[0039] and figures 1a-3. *; | [A]US2006280040 (BOURBAN STEVE [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * See abstract, paragraphs [0022]-[0030] and figures 1-6. *; | [Y]KR100685218B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-7 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0027] and figures 4-5. *; | [A]KR20140138361 (LEE YONG JAE [KR]) [A] 1-8* See abstract, paragraphs [0070]-[0085] and figures 1-9. *; | [XY]KR20150081169 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-2, 8 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0057] and figures 2-3. * [Y] 3-7 |