EP3334725 - MECHANISM OF RESISTANCE TO BET BROMODOMAIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLYAK, Kornelia 11 Orchard Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
SHU, Shaokun 183 High Street Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 03 /
BRADNER, James E. 6 Buckskin Drive Weston, MA 02493 / US | 04 /
LIN, Charles Yang 5520 La Branch Street Houston, TX 77004 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16835823.2 | 10.08.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016US46318 | Priority number, date | US201562203128P | 10.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562203128 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017027571 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3334725 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/517, C07D239/91, A61K45/06, A61K31/137, A61K31/5415, A61K31/551 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/635 (EP,KR);
A61K31/551 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61K31/5415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D215/42 (EP);
C07D255/04 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D495/14 (EP);
G01N33/57415 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/635, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/25] | C07D401/14, A61K31/517, C07D239/91 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | RESISTENZMECHANISMUS GEGENÜBER BET-BROMDOMÄNEN-INHIBITOREN | [2018/25] | English: | MECHANISM OF RESISTANCE TO BET BROMODOMAIN INHIBITORS | [2018/25] | French: | MÉCANISME DE RÉSISTANCE AUX INHIBITEURS DE BROMODOMAINES DE BET | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 20.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - E BERNASCONI ET AL, "The BET bromodomain inhibitor OTX015 shows synergy with several anticancer agents in preclinical models of mantle cell lymphoma (MCL) and multiple myeloma (MM)", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20141121), vol. 50, no. S6, page 184, XP055551521 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(14)70694-X | [Y] - TEERU BIHANI ET AL, "Resistance to everolimus driven by epigenetic regulation of MYC in ER+ breast cancers", ONCOTARGET, (20150210), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.18632/oncotarget.2964, XP055551925 [Y] 1-7 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.2964 | [Y] - ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ ET AL, "Phenothiazines induce PP2A-mediated apoptosis in T cell acute lymphoblastic leukemia", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, GB, (20140203), vol. 124, no. 2, doi:10.1172/JCI65093, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 644 - 655, XP055551553 [Y] 1-7 * page 650, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI65093 | International search | [XY]US2014005169 (ALBRECHT BRIAN K [US], et al); | [A]US2014162971 (WANG LE [US], et al); | [XY]US2014296218 (YOUNG RICHARD A [US], et al); | [XY]WO2015070020 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [XY]WO2015109286 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]); | by applicant | CA103867 | CA120184 | CA168504 | US6607916 | WO2006065724 | WO2007143081 | JP2008156311 | WO2008119109 | WO2009084693 | WO2009117769 | US2010256217 | US2010267673 | WO2011014366 | WO2011054843 | WO2011054851 | US2011143651 | US2011207789 | WO2011143669 | WO2011143660 | WO2012071374 | WO2012103059 | US8309582 | US8557812 | WO2013181488 | US8865901 |