EP3393967 - ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Materie Plastiche Pisane S.r.L. Via della Vecchia Stazione 1 56031 Bientina (Pisa) / IT | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSI, Leopoldo Via delle Colline per Legoli 1 56038 Ponsacco (Pisa) / IT | 02 /
LOMBARDI, Luca Via Marini 15D 51100 Pistoia / IT | 03 /
RUZZANTE, Marco Via Don Milani 26 51013 Chiesina Uzzanese (Pistoia) / IT | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2022/10] |
Former [2018/44] | Rossetti, Elena Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16836094.9 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016IB57919 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB09175 | 23.12.2015 Original published format: IT UB20159175 | [2018/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017109741 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393967 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393967 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y30/00, C08J5/18, C09D123/08, C08L23/08, B32B7/12, B32B27/00, B32B27/08, B32B27/18, B32B27/20, B32B27/22, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, C08K3/22, C08L51/06, C08L83/04 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L23/06 (US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B32B27/00 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/22 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08L23/26 (US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D123/0815 (EP);
B29K2995/0037 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/7145 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B32B2439/80 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C08K2003/2241 (EP,US);
C08L2203/16 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L51/06, C08L83/04, C08K2003/2241 (EP);
C09D123/0815, C08L51/06, C08L83/04, C08K2003/2241 (EP) |
Former IPC [2018/44] | B82Y30/00, C08J5/18, C09D123/08, C08L23/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | 15.06.2018 | ME | 15.06.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/44] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMER COMPOSITION | [2018/44] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE ANTIMICROBIENNE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 15.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2022
09.12.2022
ADMISSIBLE KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Peschstrasse 5 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/03] |
Former [2023/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2022
KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Peschstrasse 5 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 23.12.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2024 | 21.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 22.12.2023 | CY | 22.12.2023 | CZ | 22.12.2023 | FI | 22.12.2023 | LU | 22.12.2023 | LV | 22.12.2023 | RO | 22.12.2023 | RS | 22.12.2023 | NL | 01.01.2024 | MC | 02.01.2024 | PT | 24.06.2024 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/40] | BG | 22.12.2023 | |
CY | 22.12.2023 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2023 | ||
FI | 22.12.2023 | ||
LU | 22.12.2023 | ||
LV | 22.12.2023 | ||
RO | 22.12.2023 | ||
RS | 22.12.2023 | ||
MC | 02.01.2024 | ||
PT | 24.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/39] | BG | 22.12.2023 | |
CY | 22.12.2023 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2023 | ||
FI | 22.12.2023 | ||
LV | 22.12.2023 | ||
RO | 22.12.2023 | ||
RS | 22.12.2023 | ||
PT | 24.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 22.12.2023 | |
CY | 22.12.2023 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2023 | ||
FI | 22.12.2023 | ||
LV | 22.12.2023 | ||
RO | 22.12.2023 | ||
PT | 24.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 22.12.2023 | |
CZ | 22.12.2023 | ||
FI | 22.12.2023 | ||
RO | 22.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 22.12.2023 | |
FI | 22.12.2023 | ||
Former [2023/06] | deleted | ||
Former [2022/49] | SK | 09.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6291063 (SHAH GAUTAM PUNSHIBHAI [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,10 * * column 1, line 1 - line 24 * * column 3, line 1 - column 47 * * column 8, line 37 - line 61 * * column 11, line 41 - column 12, line 29 *; | [XY]WO2007144577 (CRODA INT PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,6,8 * * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 2, line 7 - line 10 * * page 3, line 15 - line 25 * * page 5, line 19 - line 30 * * page 9, line 15 - line 28 * [Y] 1-15; | [IY]WO2013087200 (SAUDI BASIC IND CORP [SA], et al) [I] 1-15 * claims 1,3,6,7 * * page 3, line 1 - line 14 * * page 16, line 4 - line 10 * * page 19, line 8 - line 24 * * page 20, line 18 - line 35 * [Y] 1-15; | [XP]WO2016048925 (CHEMOURS COMPANY TT LLC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * claims 1,7-10,13,14 * * page 13, line 15 - line 25 * * page 11, line 11 - line 17 ** page 3, line 3 - line 18 * | Opposition | US5889090 | WO2007144577 | - Anonymous, "silicone oil", Wikipedia, (2022113), pages 1 - 2, XP093011609 | - Anonymous, "polydimethylsiloxane", Wikipedia, (20221114), pages 1 - 13, XP093011613 | - Anonymous, "Wacker Silicone Fluids AK", Wacker product catalogue, (2001), pages 1 - 12, XP055705932 | - Anonymous, "Silicone Fluid", Shin-Etsu product catalogue, (20210100), pages 11 - 6, XP093011654 | - Anonymous, "Modified Silicone Fluid", Shin-Etsu product catalogue, (20220300), pages 1 - 8, XP093011656 | - T. HUPPMANN et al., "Antimicrobial Polymers - the Antibacterial Effect of Photoactivated Nano Titanium Dioxide Polymer Composites", AIP Conf. Proc., (20140000), vol. 1593, pages 440 - 443, XP093011659 | - N. ORNEK et al., "Comparison of the antimicrobial effect of heavy silicone oil and conventional silicone oil against endophthalmitis-causing agents", Indian Journal of Ophthalmology, (20140400), vol. 62, no. 4, pages 388 - 391, XP093011661 | - Anonymous, "Kronos 2233 titanium dioxide, for polycarbonate and other engineering plastics data sheet", Kronos international, (20140000), page 1, XP093011662 |