EP3384483 - FOVEALLY-RENDERED DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIERI, Carlin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
SPITZER, Mark 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16836188.9 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016US66613 | Priority number, date | US201662296278P | 17.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662296278 P | US201615135944 | 22.04.2016 Original published format: US201615135944 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017142613 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384483 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G09G3/3266, G09G3/3275 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
G09G3/2085 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/003 (KR,US);
G06F3/013 (KR,US);
G06T19/006 (KR,US);
G09G3/3266 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3275 (EP,KR,US);
G09G5/393 (KR,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0439 (KR,US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0218 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0221 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0232 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0267 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0291 (US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0414 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0421 (EP,US);
G09G2350/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | FOVEAL REDUZIERTE ANZEIGE | [2018/41] | English: | FOVEALLY-RENDERED DISPLAY | [2018/41] | French: | AFFICHAGE À RENDU FOVÉAL | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 02.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5600347 (THOMPSON STEPHEN P [US], et al) [A] 4,14 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2002109819 (TUVAL MIRON [IL]) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,12,16-19 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0103]; figures 4-7 * [Y] 3-5,13-15; | [Y]US2004008173 (MAEDA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,5,13,15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0158]; figures 1,8,11,14 *; | [A]US2004095492 (BAXTER CHRISTOPHER ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9,11,17-19* paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0033] , [0034] , [0048]; figures 1a, 1b, 5,9a, 9b, 9c *; | [A]US2005185281 (PERLIN KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-6,11-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008030748 (WANG YUAN-HUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 4,14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0053]; figures 5,7 * |