EP3500131 - A WHEELABLE COLLAPSIBLE TABLE AND STORAGE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdy, Chrissie 12/247 Heidelberg Road Northcote, Victoria 3070 / AU | [2024/16] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Purdy, Chrissie 12/247 Heidelberg Road Northcote, Victoria 3070 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2019/26] | De Anna, Pier Luigi DeAnna-Patent Schubertstraße 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16836277.0 | 16.08.2016 | [2019/26] | WO2016AU50755 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017027920 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500131 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500131 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47B3/10, A47B3/14, A47B3/08, A45F3/46, B62B1/04, B62B1/20, A47C4/00, A45C5/14, A45C9/00 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A45F3/46 (EP);
A45C5/14 (EP);
A47B3/0818 (EP);
A47B3/10 (EP);
B62B1/20 (EP);
A45C2009/002 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A47B3/10, A47B3/14, A47B3/08, A45F3/46, B62B1/04, B62B1/20, A47C4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLBARER ZUSAMMENKLAPPBARER TISCH UND AUFBEWAHRUNGSANORDNUNG | [2019/26] | English: | A WHEELABLE COLLAPSIBLE TABLE AND STORAGE ASSEMBLY | [2019/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE TABLE PLIABLE DÉPLAÇABLE SUR ROUES ET SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 24.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]AU2006100483 (PURDY CHRISSIE) [X] 1-4,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 5,7; | [A]US2013161456 (ADAMS WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 8* paragraph [0042]; figure 10 *; | [XI]US8480117 (PURDY CHRISSIE [AU]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document * [I] 5,8; | [XI] - Chrissie Purdy, "Parkset - A brilliant new Picnic Accessory", Youtube, (20141015), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=Pq4QI2LYqFs, (20170410), XP054977257 [X] 1-4,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 5,7 | International search | [A]AU2005100244 (PURDY CHRISSIE) [A] 1-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-3; page 1 *; | [A]US2005099102 (VILLARREAL ARTHUR [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-8; paragraphs 27-35 *; | [X]AU2006100483 (PURDY CHRISSIE) [X] 1-4, 6-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-3; page 1 *; | [A]US2010236454 (PARIZEK SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-9; paragraphs 13-28 *; | [A]TW201309227 (UNIV NAT TAIPEI TECHNOLOGY [TW]) [A] 1-8 * , English abstract retrieved from ESPACENET abstract; Figs. 1-3 *; | [X]US8480117 (PURDY CHRISSIE [AU]) [X] 1-4, 6-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-11; column 4 line 36 - column 6 line 28. *; | [A]GB2512089 (COOK CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [A] 1-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-7b; pages 9 - 10 *; | [A]US2015084383 (ZHU SHOU QIANG [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract; Figs. 1-7; paragraphs 24-29 *; | [A]US2015123362 (MANNING DANIEL DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract; Figs. 1-8 & 90-93 *; | [X] - "Parkset - A brilliant new Picnic Accessory - Now on Indiegogo", (20141015), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=Pq4QI2LYqFs, (20160826), XP054977257 [X] 1-8 * . whole document. * | Examination | US2933850 | JP3060610U |