EP3323374 - MEDICAL OBSERVATION APPARATUS AND MEDICAL OBSERVATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Olympus Medical Solutions Inc. 4-7-1 Koyasu-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0904 / JP | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Motoaki c/o SONY OLYMPUS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC. 4-7-1 Koyasu-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0904 / JP | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16836898.3 | 11.07.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016JP70467 | Priority number, date | JP20150163065 | 20.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015163065 | [2018/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017029906 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323374 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3323374 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/25, G02B21/32, H02G11/00 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
H02G11/00 (EP,US);
A61B90/25 (US);
G02B21/0012 (US);
G02B21/24 (US);
G02B21/32 (EP,US);
A61B2090/373 (US);
G02B21/368 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | A61B90/25, G02B21/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE BEOBACHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND MEDIZINISCHES BEOBACHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/21] | English: | MEDICAL OBSERVATION APPARATUS AND MEDICAL OBSERVATION SYSTEM | [2018/21] | French: | APPAREIL D'OBSERVATION MÉDICALE ET SYSTÈME D'OBSERVATION MÉDICALE | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2018 | Translation filed | 13.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2016 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | IE | 11.07.2020 | LU | 11.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 11.07.2016 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.07.2016 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0873826 (COMAU SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8* column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 32; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1352721 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP2829369 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] - [0024] - paragraphs [0029] , [0099] - [0102]; figures 1,5, *; | [A]WO2015046081 (SONY OLYMPUS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6368380 (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 1-8 * , page 6, lower left column, line 5 to lower right column, line 17; fig. 1 to 5 & US 4793203 A column 5, lines 14 to 51; fig. 1 to 5 & EP 260219 A1 *; | [A]JP2002370190 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0011]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004208845 (MITAKA KOKI KK) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0006]; fig. 1 & US 2004/0138650 A1 paragraphs [0005] to [0009]; fig. 1 & EP 1434076 A1 *; | [A]US2005057800 (OBREBSKI ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0063] to [0076]; fig. 1 to 2 & DE 10357496 A1 * |