EP3338212 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GEOGRAPHIC LOCATION BASED ELECTRONIC SECURITY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Averon US, Inc. 2654 W. Horizon Ridge Parkway, No. B5-229 Henderson, NV 89052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Averon US, Inc. 2654 W. Horizon Ridge Parkway, No. B5-229 Henderson, Nevada 89052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHR, Edward 1430 Colby Ave. Apt 302 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
MEHR, Edward 424 N. Bell Flower Blvd., Unit 120 Long Beach, CA 90814 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16837962.6 | 22.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016US48084 | Priority number, date | US201562207883P | 20.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562207883 P | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017031504 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338212 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, G06F21/00, G06F21/32, H04W12/06, H04L29/06, G06F21/34, H04W4/80 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
H04L63/107 (US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | G06F21/31, G06F21/00, G06F21/32, H04W12/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE SICHERHEITSVERWALTUNG AUF DER BASIS EINES GEOGRAFISCHEN STANDORTES | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GEOGRAPHIC LOCATION BASED ELECTRONIC SECURITY MANAGEMENT | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE GESTION DE SÉCURITÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE EN FONCTION DE L'EMPLACEMENT GÉOGRAPHIQUE | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 21.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014157392 (SMITH FRED HEWITT [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2014351899 (DENNIS CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0068] *; | [A]US9075979 (QUERU JEAN BAPTISTE MAURICE [US]) [A] 1-21* column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 55 * | International search | [A]US2012203663 (SINCLAIR MATTHEW FRAZER [AU], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-17* entire document *; | [Y]GB2492050 (KUSELER TORBEN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3, 8-10, 15-17 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013203383 (STOPEL DIMA [IL], et al) [Y] 3, 10, 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014289116 (POLIVANYI IGOR [US]) [Y] 1-3, 8-10, 15-17 * entire document * |