EP3343778 - SIGNAL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph And Telephone Corporation 5-1 Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Hiroshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
NAGATANI, Munehiko c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
NOSAKA, Hideyuki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
SANO, Akihide c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 05 /
MIYAMOTO, Yutaka c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16838797.5 | 19.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016JP03791 | Priority number, date | JP20150168219 | 27.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015168219 | [2018/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017033446 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343778 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343778 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/66, H04J11/00, H03M1/74 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H04L27/2634 (EP,US);
H03M1/66 (US);
H03M1/662 (EP,US);
H03M1/74 (US);
H04J11/00 (EP,US);
H04J11/0056 (US);
H04J11/0036 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | H03M1/66, H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/27] | English: | SIGNAL GENERATING DEVICE | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE SIGNAL | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2018 | Translation filed | 22.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 22.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.12.2021 | 21.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2016 | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CY | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | MK | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | TR | 03.08.2022 | IE | 19.08.2022 | LU | 19.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2782257 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0058] *[I] 6-8,10-13 | International search | [A]JPS5869145 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-13 * , (Family: none) *; | [A] - H UANG,HAO et al., "An 8-bit 100-GS/s Distributed DAC in 28-nm CMOS for Optical Communications", IEEE Trans. Micro. Theo. Tech., (20150400), vol. 63, no. 4, pages 1211 - 1218, XP 011577396 [A] 1-13 | [A] - LAPERLE,CHARLES et al., "Advances in High- Speed DACs, ADCs, and DSP for Optical Coherent Transceivers", J. Lightw. Technol., (20140215), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 629 - 643, XP 011537157 [A] 1-13 | [PX] - YAMAZAKI,HIROSHI et al., "Digital-Preprocessed Analog-Multiplexed DAC for Ultrawideband Multilevel Transmitter", J. Lightw. Technol., vol. 34, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/JLT.2015.2508040, pages 1579 - 1584, XP011601719 [PX] 1-3, 4-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2015.2508040 |