EP3339838 - ANALYSIS OF FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER BY USING INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kanako c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Ikuo c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Takeshi c/o Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 04 /
SHIMOAKA, Takafumi c/o Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16839153.0 | 17.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016JP73971 | Priority number, date | JP20150163854 | 21.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015163854 | [2018/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017033806 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339838 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/552, G01N21/3563, D06M13/00, C09D5/00, G01N33/36, G01N21/84, // G01N21/35 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G01N21/552 (EP);
D06M15/277 (EP);
G01N21/3563 (EP);
G01N21/8422 (EP);
G01N33/36 (EP);
D06M2101/32 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | G01N21/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | ANALYSE VON FLUORHALTIGEM POLYMER MIT INFRAROTSPEKTROSKOPIE | [2018/26] | English: | ANALYSIS OF FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER BY USING INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY | [2018/26] | French: | ANALYSE D'UN POLYMÈRE FLUORÉ PAR SPECTROSCOPIE INFRAROUGE | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2018 | Translation filed | 20.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 20.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19502134 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 4 - column 3, line 49 *; | [Y]JP2010164539 (ULVAC CORP) [Y] 1-6* paragraphs [0031] - [0035] - [0044] - [0045] - [0047] - [0048]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP2762538 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0024] , [0026] , [0089] - [0091] *; | [YD]WO2015020100 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [YD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0 13] , [0 19] , [0022] *; | [Y]CN104594045 (UNIV SOOCHOW) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0025] - [0026] * | International search | [A]JP2012185045 (UNIV OF SCIENCE TOKYO, et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0052], [0088] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013217751 (UNIV CHIBA) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0024] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005522694 (Cascade Technologies Ltd.) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0037] & US 2005/0157303 A1 paragraph [0063] & GB 208100 D & GB 208100 DO & WO 2003/087787 A1 & EP 1493017 B1 & CA 2482402 A & CN 1659429 A & RU 2004132718 A & AU 2003219320 A & KR 10-0959625 B1 & ES 2392834 T * |