EP3343050 - ARTICULATED CONNECTION FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mi Refugio Infantil, S.L. C/ Charinas 20 18140 La Zubia (Granada) / ES | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA CORREDOR, Andrey, Vladimir C/ Charinas 20 18140 La Zubia (Granada) / ES | 02 /
MEDINA QUERO, Patricia C/ Charinas 20 18140 La Zubia (Granada) / ES | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16840874.8 | 26.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016ES70613 | Priority number, date | ES20150031235 | 28.08.2015 Original published format: ES 201531235 | [2018/27] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037320 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343050 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/10, F16C11/04, F16M11/04 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
F16C11/04 (EP);
F16C11/045 (ES);
F16C11/10 (EP);
F16M2200/024 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | F16C11/10, F16C11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | GELENKIGE VERBINDUNG FÜR DREIDIMENSIONALE STRUKTUREN | [2018/27] | English: | ARTICULATED CONNECTION FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES | [2018/27] | French: | LIAISON ARTICULÉE POUR STRUCTURES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2018 | Translation filed | 20.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 20.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4929113 (SHEU YIN-PING [TW]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * columns 1-3 *; | [XA]US5060894 (HILLINGER GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * the whole document * [A] 3,7,8; | [A]US2011018226 (JESSIE JR DONALD K [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031] - [0033] * | International search | [A]US4582445 (WARSHAWSKY JEROME [US]) [A] 1, 2, 6, 9 * , column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 57; figures 2-4. *; | [A]US5039118 (HUANG MING-TAI [TW]) [A] 1, 2, 6, 9* , column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 45; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2012014744 (LIN CHIEN-TING [US]) [A] 1, 2, 6, 9 * , paragraphs [14-20]; figures 2-4. * |