EP3345051 - PROJECTION DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hong Kong Beida Jade Bird Display Limited 76/F Unit 7605 The Center 99 Queen's Road Central Hong Kong / CN | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lei 8012 Corona Ave. NE Albuquerque, New Mexico 87122 / US | 02 /
OU, Fang 402 S. Garfield Ave. Unit 1 Monterey Park, California 91754 / US | 03 /
LI, Qiming 1876 Smarty Jones St. Albuquerque, New Mexico 87123 / US | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2018/28] | Finnegan Europe LLP 16 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16840897.9 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016IB01342 | Priority number, date | US201562214395P | 04.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562214395 P | US201562258072P | 20.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562258072 P | US201562259810P | 25.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562259810 P | US201615007959 | 27.01.2016 Original published format: US201615007959 | US201615239467 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: US201615239467 | US201615246447 | 24.08.2016 Original published format: US201615246447 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037537 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345051 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345051 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, G03B21/20, G03B21/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
G03B21/2033 (EP);
H01L25/167 (US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G03B21/2013 (EP);
H01L25/50 (US);
H01L27/153 (US);
H01L27/156 (US);
H01L33/52 (US);
H01L33/58 (US);
H01L33/60 (US);
H01L33/62 (US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/19 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73267 (EP,US);
H01L2224/82 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92244 (EP,US);
H01L25/073 (US);
H01L25/075 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1203 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13064 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13069 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0058 (US);
H01L2933/0066 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | G03B21/20, G03B21/00, // H01L25/075 | ||
Former IPC [2018/28] | G03B21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSANZEIGESYSTEM | [2018/28] | English: | PROJECTION DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2018/28] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE PAR PROJECTION | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 20.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2016 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 01.09.2016 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.09.2016 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2002135553 (NAGAI HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * paragraphs [0109] - [0260]; figures 1-20 * [A] 3-5 [Y] 15 [I] 10-14; | [YA]US2003210213 (WU JIAHN-CHANG [TW]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [0030]; figure 3 * [A] 1,6-15; | [A]US2004021833 (KOIDE JUN [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 21 *; | [XAY]US2013002730 (TANIGAWA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0036] - [0131] - [0153] - [0155]; figures 1-4,15 * [A] 6-15 [Y] 2-5; | [YA]WO2015037218 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0056] - [0079]; figure 5 *[A] 1-14 | International search | [Y]US5653522 (LOUCKS BRYAN E [US]) [Y] 1-19 * description, column 3, line 26 to column 6, line 33 and figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006023167 (CHIANG PO LIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [Y]CN101634800 (CHENGDU OUHENG PHOTOELECTRIC T) [Y] 1-19 * description, page 4, lines 8 to 21 and figures 1 and 4 *; | [A]CN201464787U (ZHEJIANG CONNWII ELECTRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | Examination | US2014098556 | US2014159064 | WO2014139849 | CN104617121 |