EP3345969 - COMPOSITION AND MOLDED OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Shuugo c/o JSR CORPORATION 9-2 Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 02 /
SHIBATA, Masahiro c/o JSR CORPORATION 9-2 Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 03 /
OOKUBO, Akihiko c/o JSR CORPORATION 9-2 Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16841560.2 | 22.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016JP74368 | Priority number, date | JP20150172649 | 02.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015172649 | JP20150243818 | 15.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015243818 | [2018/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017038528 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345969 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08K3/04, C08L21/00, C08K9/08, D06M15/227 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/042 (EP,US);
C08J5/04 (EP,US);
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08J2300/22 (US);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US);
C08J2347/00 (US);
C08J2400/106 (EP,US);
C08J2453/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/08, C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08K3/04, C08L101/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/28] | C08L101/00, C08K3/04, C08L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMKÖRPER | [2018/28] | English: | COMPOSITION AND MOLDED OBJECT | [2018/28] | French: | COMPOSITION ET OBJET MOULÉ | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2018 | Translation filed | 12.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 12.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 29.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005073291 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP2476799 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1-13* example -; claim - *; | [E]EP3170869 (JSR CORP [JP]) [E] 1-13 * example -; claim -; table - * | International search | [XA]JP2005213479 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1, 3, 5, 11, 12 * , claims; paragraph [0020] & WO 2005/073291 A1 * [A] 2, 4, 6-10; | [XA]JP2013227459 (HENKEL JAPAN LTD) [X] 6, 7, 12 * , claims; examples & US 2015/0045488 A1 claims; examples & WO 2013/162058 A1 & EP 2841517 A1 & TW 201343837 A & CA 2864292 A & CN 104271695 A & KR 10-2015-0008860 A & MX 2014012923 A & RU 2014147578 A * [A] 1-5, 8-11; | [XA]WO2014087767 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1, 2, 11, 12 * , claims; paragraph [0020] (Family: none) * [A] 3-10; | [A]JP2014234509 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2015186667 (JAPAN ELASTOMER CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-12* , claims; examples & TW 201612201 A * |