EP3342204 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR UPLOADING DATA IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING A PLURALITY OF RADIO ACCESS INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyun-Joo Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Chul-Ho Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jin-Hyoung Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Yong-Seok Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jin-Ho Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Joon-Young Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16842344.0 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016KR09838 | Priority number, date | KR20150125454 | 04.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150125454 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017039378 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3342204 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3342204 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/08, H04L47/36, H04L67/5683, // H04W88/06 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H04L47/365 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (US);
H04L67/5683 (EP,US);
H04W28/086 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | H04W28/02, H04W28/06, H04W28/08, H04W88/06, H04W88/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HOCHLADEN VON DATEN IN EIN MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG MEHRERER FUNKZUGANGSSCHNITTSTELLEN | [2018/27] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR UPLOADING DATA IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING A PLURALITY OF RADIO ACCESS INTERFACES | [2018/27] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TÉLÉVERSER DES DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE PRENANT EN CHARGE UNE PLURALITÉ D'INTERFACES D'ACCÈS RADIO | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2016 | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | BG | 24.08.2022 | CY | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | MK | 24.08.2022 | MT | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | IE | 02.09.2022 | LU | 02.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | FR | 24.10.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
BG | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.09.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013021968 (REZNIK ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,15 * paragraph [0078]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086]; figure 6 *[I] 5-8,13,14 | International search | [Y]US2010154044 (MANKU TAJINDER [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0028], [0039]; claims 1-4, 15; and figure 4. *; | [Y]WO2014113990 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0051], [0092]-[0093]; claim 1; and figure 7. *; | [A]US2014317176 (LUECKE RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0057]-[0064]; claim 1; and figure 3. *; | [A]US2014313954 (CHOI JUN KYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0044]-[0049]; claim 1; and figure 4. *; | [Y]KR20150025484 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 4, 12 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0033]; claims 9-10; and figure 1. * |