EP3329086 - VARIABLE RATE STEAM INJECTION, INCLUDING VIA SOLAR POWER FOR ENHANCED OIL RECOVERY, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glasspoint Solar, Inc. 47669 Fremont Boulevard Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Glasspoint Solar, Inc. 46421 Landing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Daniel Villa 1040 Way 2414 Muscat Sultanate Of Oman / OM | 02 /
VON BEHRENS, Peter, Emery 110 Emma Lane Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
O'DONNELL, John, Setel 4015 Arbol Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 04 /
MOHAMMADI, Ali, Hassan Ibrahim House No. 65 Wadi Al Athaiba Street (street No. 44) Muscat Oman / OM | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Cornford, James Robert Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16842918.1 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016US49724 | Priority number, date | US201562213078P | 01.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562213078 P | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017040682 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329086 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/16, E21B43/24, E21B36/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
E21B43/2406 (EP,US);
E21B43/24 (US);
E21B36/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | DAMPFEINSPRITZUNG MIT VARIABLER RATE, EINSCHLIESSLICH ÜBER SOLARENERGIE ZUR VERBESSERTEN ÖLRÜCKGEWINNUNG, SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2018/23] | English: | VARIABLE RATE STEAM INJECTION, INCLUDING VIA SOLAR POWER FOR ENHANCED OIL RECOVERY, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2018/23] | French: | INJECTION DE VAPEUR À DÉBIT VARIABLE, Y COMPRIS PAR LE BIAIS DE L'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE POUR UNE EXTRACTION DE PÉTROLE AMÉLIORÉE, ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 28.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 02.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011094755 (CORBETT THOMAS G [US], et al) [Y] 90-97, 100-102 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0053], [0067]; and figure 2A. *; | [Y]US2012273195 (WHEELER THOMAS J [US], et al) [Y] 51-60, 76-89 * See paragraphs [0016], [0021]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2013091842 (KAUFMANN GABRIEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-104* See paragraphs [0031]-[0046]; and figures 1-2, 3A-3B, 4-6. *; | [XY]WO2014107688 (GLASSPOINT SOLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-50, 61-75, 98-99 , 103-104 * See paragraphs [0002], [0026]-[0044], [0061]-[0098]; and figures 1, 2A-2D, 7A, 8A-8C. * [Y] 51-60, 76-97 , 100-102; | [A]US2014318792 (CHEN HUIJUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-104 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0040]; and figures 1-3. * |