EP3348548 - NITRIC OXIDE-RELEASING PRODRUG MOLECULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd Xunqiao Linhai Taizhou, Zhejiang 317024 / CN | For all designated states Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., Ltd Cai Lun Rd538 Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GE, Jian c/o Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., LTD Zhang Heng Rd 1999,Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yunfei c/o Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., LTD Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Zhen c/o Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., LTD Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Yijin c/o Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., LTD Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Jiamiao c/o Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., LTD Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
CHENG, Tao c/o Shanghai Synergy Pharmaceutical Sciences Co., LTD Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/29] | 01 /
GE, Jian Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Yunfei Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Zhen Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
04 /
WANG, Yijin Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
05 /
WANG, Jiamiao Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
06 /
CHENG, Tao Zhang Heng Rd 1999, Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 16843639.2 | 06.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016CN98217 | Priority number, date | CN201510563200 | 07.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510563200 | [2018/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017041701 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348548 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/91, C07D217/24, A61K31/517, A61P9/00, A61K31/4418, A61K31/519, A61K31/5355, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P25/28 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/5355 (EP,US);
A61K31/4418 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP,US);
C07D217/24 (EP,US);
C07D239/91 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | C07D239/91, C07D217/24, A61K31/517, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | STICKOXIDFREISETZENDES PRODRUG-MOLEKÜL | [2018/29] | English: | NITRIC OXIDE-RELEASING PRODRUG MOLECULE | [2018/29] | French: | MOLÉCULE DE PROMÉDICAMENT LIBÉRANT DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2018 | Translation filed | 02.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 02.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2008092231 (RESVERLOGIX CORP [CA], et al) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2010123975 (RESVERLOGIX CORP [CA], et al) [YD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y] - MILLER M R ET AL, "Recent developments in nitric oxide donor drugs", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL, UK, vol. 151, no. 3, doi:10.1038/SJ.BJP.0707224, ISSN 0007-1188, (20070601), pages 305 - 321, (20070402), XP002520652 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.BJP.0707224 | [Y] - SWITZER C H ET AL, "The emergence of nitroxyl (HNO) as a pharmacological agent", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. BIOENERGETICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1787, no. 7, ISSN 0005-2728, (20090701), pages 835 - 840, (20090506), XP026802134 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - KEVIN G. MCLURE ET AL, "Accurate bond and angle parameters for X-ray protein structure refinement", PLOS ONE, (20131231), vol. 47, no. 12, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0083190, page 392, XP055335083 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0083190 | International search | [Y]WO2005032559 (RESVERLOGIX CORP [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , see description, page 17, paragraph 2, and embodiments *; | [Y]CN101641339 (RESVERLOGIX CORP CA) [Y] 1-13 * , see abstract, and embodiments *; | [Y]CN102458405 (RESVERLOGIX CORP) [Y] 1-13* , see abstract, and embodiments * |