EP3349332 - ROTOR AND MOTOR INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jangwon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
OH, Seungsuk IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Heon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Junho IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Jaemin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Dosun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 07 /
NAM, Hyounguk IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 16844681.3 | 07.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016KR10030 | Priority number, date | US201562215708P | 08.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562215708 P | KR20160063069 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160063069 | KR20160063072 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160063072 | [2018/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017043865 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349332 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3349332 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K1/30, // H02K1/32 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K1/27915 (KR);
D06F37/304 (KR);
H02K1/2773 (EP);
H02K1/28 (KR);
H02K1/30 (EP);
H02K15/03 (KR);
H02K15/12 (KR);
H02K5/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | H02K1/27, H02K7/00, H02K5/04, H02K1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTOR UND MOTOR DAMIT | [2018/29] | English: | ROTOR AND MOTOR INCLUDING SAME | [2018/29] | French: | ROTOR ET MOTEUR LE COMPRENANT | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2018 | Translation filed | 13.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 13.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2016 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013278094 (PETERSON GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 6 *; | [XYI]EP2722971 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11-14 * paragraph [0056]; figures 8,10,11 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 10,15; | [X]EP2728720 (ZHONGSHAN BROAD OCEAN MOTOR CO [CN]) [X] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2014225471 (KAWANAMI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 1,2,5 a-d * | International search | [A]JP2004254493 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, claims 1-5 and figures 1-5. *; | [XY]KR20060121001 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [X] 20 * See abstract, paragraphs [19]-[62] and figures 1-5. * [Y] 1-19; | [A]EP2065510 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1-20* See abstract, claims 1-7 and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]US2009301142 (MARIONI ELIO [IT]) [Y] 1-19 * See abstract, paragraphs [40-[48] and figure 4. *; | [Y]KR20140049201 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 16 * See abstract, paragraphs [60]-[69] and figures 8-9. * | Examination | JP2004194419 |