EP3347524 - ROUNDABOUT AND METHOD OF MAKING A ROUNDABOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/29] | MODULAR BLOCK SYSTEM FOR ROUNDABOUTS | ||
[2020/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZKXKZ, LLC 4 Constitution Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANUCCI, Jerome P. 4 Constitution Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
STEPANIAN, Aram 6901 California Avenue SW Seattle, WA 98136 / US | 03 /
LANIK, Adam 1150 21 St Street Unit 26 San Diego, CA 92102 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/29] | 01 /
FANUCCI, Jerome, P. 4 Constitution Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
02 /
STEPANIAN, Aram 6901 California Avenue SW Seattle, WA 98136 / US | |||
03 /
LANIK, Adam 1150 21 St Street Unit 26 San Diego, CA 92102 / US | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 16845114.4 | 09.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US50932 | Priority number, date | US201562217412P | 11.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562217412 P | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044734 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347524 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3347524 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E01C1/02, E01F1/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
E01C1/02 (EP,US);
E01C11/00 (US);
E01C11/221 (US);
E01C19/52 (US);
E01C5/00 (US);
E01C5/20 (US);
E01C5/22 (US);
E01F1/00 (EP,US);
E01C2201/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | E01C11/22, E01C1/02, E01F9/50, E01F15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISVERKEHR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES KREISVERKEHRS | [2020/05] | English: | ROUNDABOUT AND METHOD OF MAKING A ROUNDABOUT | [2020/05] | French: | CARREFOUR GIRATOIRE ET MÉTHODE DE RÉALISATION D'UN CARREFOUR GIRATOIRE | [2020/05] |
Former [2018/29] | MODULARES BLOCKSYSTEM FÜR KREISVERKEHRE | ||
Former [2018/29] | MODULAR BLOCK SYSTEM FOR ROUNDABOUTS | ||
Former [2018/29] | SYSTÈME DE BLOC MODULAIRE POUR CARREFOURS GIRATOIRES | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2016 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | ES | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | IT | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | TR | 23.12.2020 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | IE | 09.09.2021 | LU | 09.09.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 09.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 09.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 09.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 09.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2310235 (HEATH STEPHEN CLIVE JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,8,9,11,13,14 * figures 1-5 * * the whole document *; | [X]DE202009002775U (PH GUMMITECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,7-11,13,14 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0031] , [0033] , [0034] * * the whole document *; | [A]KR101253691B (KANG MI SOOK [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3-6 ** the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5286136 (MANDISH THEODORE O [US], et al) [Y] 18, 19 * entire document *; | [Y]GB2310235 (HEATH STEPHEN CLIVE JOHN [GB]) [Y] 15 * entire document *; | [A]EP1199408 (LUEFT PETER [DE]) [A] 1-28* see machine translation 1 *; | [Y]DE102004020101 (RAUSCH PETER [AT]) [Y] 2, 23, 24, 26 * see machine translation *; | [XY]DE202009002775U (PH GUMMITECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1, 9-12, 16, 17, 21, 22, 25, 27 * see machine translation ' * [Y] 2, 6, 7, 15, 18-20, 23, 24, 26, 28; | [Y]US2014270938 (MAIN BRUCE W [US], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 20, 28 * entire document * | by applicant | GB2310235 | DE202009002775U |