EP3347469 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Youhealth Biotech, Limited Suite 4-210 Governors Square 23 Lime Tree Bay Avenue Grand Cayman KYI-1209 / KY | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Lianghong 17 Hunnan District Pujiangyuan Shenyang Liaoning 110000 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Jie 17 Hunnan District Pujiangyuan Shenyang Liaoning 110000 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Ling 17 Hunnan District Pujiangyuan Shenyang Liaoning 110000 / CN | 04 /
AI, Michael 17 Hunnan District Pujiangyuan Shenyang Liaoning 110000 / CN | 05 /
LI, Oulan 17 Hunnan District Pujiangyuan Shenyang Liaoning 110000 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Kang 14329 San Dieguito Road San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 16845193.8 | 09.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US51117 | Priority number, date | US201562216374P | 10.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562216374 P | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017044857 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3347469 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/90, C12N15/87, C12N15/113, A61K48/00, A61P27/06 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/465 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K9/0051 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61P27/06 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/1135 (US);
A61K48/00 (US);
C12N2310/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GLAUKOM | [2018/29] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA | [2018/29] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU GLAUCOME | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2021 | 30.09.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014204725 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15*cf. abstract, section [0003] at page 1, section [0009] at page 3, section [0041] covering pages 14-16, section [0063] at page 25, sections [00179] and [00180] at page 62, section [00262] at page 84, upper table at page 116, example 14 at page 150, example 19 at page 166, claim 1*; | [Y] - SURIYAPPERUMA S P ET AL, "CANDIDATE GENE SCREENING OF ADULT - ONSET PRIMARY GLAUCOMA ( POAG ) LINKED TO 2P14 - P16", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2003), Database accession no. PREV200300512404, XP009510507 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [XY]US2015232883 (DAHLMAN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5 * ; paragraph [0007], [0019], [0058], [0112], [0125], [0189], [0215], [0246], [0255], [0290], [0333], [0703], and [0742] * [Y] 4, 6-10, 20-26, 29-30; | [Y]WO2014043291 (QUARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 29 * ; page 55, line 24 *; | [Y] - BURDON, KP et al., "Glaucoma Risk Alleles at CDKN2B-AS1 Are Associated with Lower Intraocular Pressure", Normal- tension Glaucoma, and Advanced Glaucoma. Ophthalmology., (20120800), vol. 119, no. 8, pages 1539 - 1545, XP028408166 [Y] 4, 6, 10 * ; Abstract; Tables 5, and 7; page 1540, 1st column, 2nd paragraph; DOI: 10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.02.004 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.02.004 | [Y] - HARA, E et al., "Regulation of p16 CDKN2 Expression and Its Implications for Cell Immortalization and Senescence", Molecular and Cellular Biology., (19960300), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 859 - 867, XP055385008 [Y] 7-10, 20-24, 26-27, 29-30 | [Y] - GU, F et al., "Common genetic variants in the 9p21 region and their associations with multiple tumours.", British Journal of Cancer., (20130129), vol. 108, pages 1378 - 1836, XP055385011 [Y] 7-9, 25 * ; page 1380, 2nd column, 2nd paragraph; Abstract; Table 2a; DOI: 10.1038/bjc.2013.7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/bjc.2013.7 | [Y] - CARNES, MU et al., "Discovery and Functional Annotation of SIX6 Variants in Primary Open-Angle Glaucoma.", PLOS-Genetics., (20140329), vol. 10, no. 5, page e1004372, XP055385013 [Y] 11-13, 20, 28 * ; Abstract; page 1; 2nd column, 1st paragraph; page 1, 2nd column, 2nd paragraph; page 2, 1st column, 3rd paragraph; DOI: 10.1371/joumal.pgen.1004372 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1004372 | [Y] - STRAUSBERG, RL et al., "Generation and initial analysis of more than 15,000 full-length human and mouse cDNA sequences.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the U.S.A., (20021224), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16899 - 16903, XP002245220 [Y] 12-13, 27 * ; DOI: 10.1073/pnas.242603899; SEQ ID NO: 37 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.242603899 | [A] - GARCIA-ESCUDERO, V. et al., "Prevention of Senescence Progression in Reversibly Immortalized Human Ensheathing Glia Permits Their Survival After Deimmortalization.", The American Society of Gene and Cell Therapy ., (20100200), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 394 - 403, XP055385018 [A] 1-13, 20-30 * ; DOI:10.1038/mt.2009.268 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2009.268 | by applicant | WO2014204725 | - SURIYAPPERUMA, S. P. et al., "Candidate Gene Screening of Adult-onset Primary Glaucoma (POAG) Linked to 2p14 - p16", Investigative Opthalmology & Visual Science, (20030000), vol. 44, page 1132, XP009510507 | - CARNES, M. U. et al., "Discovery and Functional Annotation of SIX6 variants in Primary Open-Angle Glaucoma", PLOS-GENETICS, (20140000), vol. 10, page E1004372 | - MAKAROVA, K.S. et al., "An updated evolutionary classification of CRISPR-Cas systems", Nat Rev Microbiol, (20150000), vol. 13, doi:10.1038/nrmicro3569, pages 722 - 736, XP055271841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro3569 | - SHMAKOV, S et al., "Discovery and Functional Characterization of Diverse Class 2 CRISPR-Cas Systems", Mol Cell, (20150000), vol. 60, pages 1 - 13 | - JINEK et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, pages 816 - 821, XP055549487 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AKP81606.1 | - KARLINALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 |