EP3340014 - TEXT INPUT METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON GESTURE RECOGNITION, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Prtek Co. Ltd. Room 4CB-20 Block A Zhongyin Building No. 5021 Caitian Road, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518026 / CN | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Guohua Room 2B, Block 5, Weilanhaian Garden Houhai Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518053 / CN | [2018/42] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
LIU, Guohua Room 4cb-20 4/F Block A Zhongyin Building No.5021 Caitian Road Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518026 / CN | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16845631.7 | 24.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016CN96501 | Priority number, date | CN201510593632 | 17.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510593632 | [2018/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017045517 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340014 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06F3/0488, G06F3/04883, G06F3/16, G06V30/228, G06V30/32, G06V40/20 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/01 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06V30/228 (EP,US);
G06V30/347 (EP,US);
G06V40/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06K9/22, G06F3/0488 | ||
Former IPC [2018/26] | G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | TEXTEINGABEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG AUF DER GRUNDLAGE VON GESTENERKENNUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2018/26] | English: | TEXT INPUT METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON GESTURE RECOGNITION, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SAISIE DE TEXTE BASÉS SUR LA RECONNAISSANCE GESTUELLE, ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2018 | Translation filed | 23.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 23.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2014205639 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,13 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 22 * * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 9; figures 1,2, 3B * * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 10; figure 4 * * page 9, line 25 - page 11, line 24; figures 5, 6 * [A] 4,6,10,12 [Y] 3,9; | [Y] - NAM Y ET AL, "RECOGNITION OF HAND GESTURES WITH 3D, NONLINEAR ARM MOVEMENT", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970101), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0167-8655(96)00121-3, ISSN 0167-8655, pages 105 - 113, XP000682882 [Y] 3,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-8655(96)00121-3 | International search | [A]US2010333163 (DALY CURTIS N [US]) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102279668 (RICOH CO., LTD.) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2012151914 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [A] 1-13* , the whole document *; | [X]CN103226388 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [X] 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 11, 13 * , description, paragraph [0049], and claim 2 *; | [PX]CN105302298 (SHENZHEN GUOHUA IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) [PX] 1-13 * , claims 1-12, and description, paragraphs [0057]-[0111] * |