EP3371312 - VIRAL VECTOR ASSAY AND VECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trizell Ltd. Sanderum House Oakley Road Chinnor, Oxfordshire OX39 4TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Trizell Ltd. Sanderum House Oakley Road Chinnor Oxfordshire OX39 4TW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Nigel Sanderum House Oakley Road Chinnor Oxfordshire OX39 4TW / GB | 02 /
LESCH, Hanna, P. Microkatu 1S 70210 Kuopio / FI | 03 /
MYKKANEN, Jenni Microkatu 1S 70210 Kuopio / FI | 04 /
PAULO, Sara Microkatu 1S 70210 Kuopio / FI | 05 /
HASSINEN, Minna Microkatu 1S 70210 Kuopio / FI | 06 /
SHAW, Robert Microkatu 1S 70210 Kuopio / FI | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16847094.6 | 09.09.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016US50959 | Priority number, date | US201562218810P | 15.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562218810 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048599 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371312 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/79, C12N15/85, C07K14/52 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10351 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | VIRUSVEKTORTEST UND VEKTOR | [2018/37] | English: | VIRAL VECTOR ASSAY AND VECTOR | [2018/37] | French: | ANALYSE DE VECTEUR VIRAL ET VECTEUR | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2018/37] | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 04.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2018 | Decision despatched | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2018 | Decision despatched | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007111296 (YIN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - BOYAN GRIGOROV ET AL, "Rapid Titration of Measles and Other Viruses: Optimization with Determination of Replication Cycle Length", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0024135, page e24135, XP055567074 [X] 1-15 * page 2, column r - page 10, column r; figures 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0024135 | International search | [X] - WEAVER et al., "Evaluation of adenoviral vectors by flow cytometry", Methods, (20000700), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 297 - 312, XP004466934 [X] 1-11 * . Especially pg 298 col 2 para 3-4, pg 299 col 1 para 2, pg 300 col 1 para 3, pg 300 col 2 para 1, pg 301 fig 1, pg 302 fig 2, pg 305 col 1 para 2, pg 305 col 2 para 1, pg 311 col 2 para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/meth.2000.1010 | [XY] - LAROCCA et al., "Oncolytic adenovirus expressing interferon alpha in a syngeneic Syrian hamster model for the treatment of pancreatic cancer", Surgery, (20150500), vol. 157, no. 5, pages 888 - 898, XP055371056 [X] 12-19, 27-34 * . Especially pg 4 para 2-3, pg 4 para 7, pg 5 para 7, pg 6 para 7, pg 7 para 1 * [Y] 20-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surg.2015.01.006 | [Y] - KHABAR et al., "MTS interferon assay: a simplified cellular dehydrogenase assay for interferon activity using a water-soluble tetrazolium salt", J Interferon Cytokine Res, (19960100), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 31 - 33, XP055371061 [Y] 20-26 * . Especially pg 31 col 1 para 2, pg 31 col 2 para 3, pg 32 fig 2, pg 32 col 1 para 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/jir.1996.16.31 |