EP3354171 - JUICER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Geant Industrial Co., Ltd Building 3 No.200 Yechang Road Yexie Town Songjiang District Shanghai 201609 / CN | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Qi Building 3 No.200 Yechang Road Yexie Town Songjiang District Shanghai 201609 / CN | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 16848071.3 | 19.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016CN99280 | Priority number, date | CN201520734473U | 21.09.2015 Original published format: CN 201520734473 U | [2018/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017050190 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354171 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J19/02, A23N1/00, A47J19/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A47J19/02 (EP,US);
A23N1/00 (EP,US);
A23N1/003 (US);
A47J19/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | A47J19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | ENTSAFTER | [2018/31] | English: | JUICER | [2018/31] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | Translation filed | 27.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8303953 (ORANGEMATIC INC [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0927521 (INNOVACIONES MECANICAS S A [ES]) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]US2008028943 (LEE CHANG SEOK [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] *; | [A]CN201707729U (YONG CHEN) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]CN201780630U (QINGDAO AUCMA CO LTD) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]CN104323695 (XINHUA XINCHENG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [Y]CN204378830U (SHANGHAI JUANG IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN202801285U (GD XINBAO ELEC APPL HOLDINGS) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN203909943U (LIUZHOU SANHENG GONGCHUANG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [Y]CN104323695 (XINHUA XINCHENG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description, page 2, and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN204297510U (SHANGHAI JUANG IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description, pages 2-3, and figures 1-8 *; | [Y]CN204292871U (SHANGHAI JUANG IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description, page 2, and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN204297192U (SHANGHAI JUANG IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * . description. pages 3-4, and figures 1-14 *; | [Y]CN204378830U (SHANGHAI JUANG IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , claims 1-10, description, pages 6-8, and figures 1-27 *; | [A]CN204576661U (CHINA ELECTTRONICS GREATWALL CHANGSHA INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN204813302U (HUIZHOU LONGHAI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document * |