EP3354719 - SUBSTRATE FOR CELL CULTURE, CELL CULTURE METHOD USING SAME, CELL CULTURE VESSEL, AND USE AS SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Haruna c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Niigata ResearchLaboratory 182 Tayuhama Shinwari Kita-ku Niigata-shi Niigata 950-3112 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Shin c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI, Yasunori c/o FUKUYAMA UNIVERSITY 985-1 Aza Sanzo Higashimura-cho Fukuyama-shi Hiroshima 729-0292 / JP | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16848700.7 | 23.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016JP78125 | Priority number, date | JP20150187845 | 25.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015187845 | [2018/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017051912 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354719 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00, C08G63/199, C08G63/66, C08L67/02, C12N5/07, C12N5/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C12N5/0656 (EP,US);
C08G63/199 (EP,US);
C08G63/66 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C12M23/20 (EP,US);
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
C12N2533/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L25/14 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L33/04 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L67/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2018/31] | C12M3/00, C08G63/199, C08G63/66, C08L67/02, C12N5/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | SUBSTRAT FÜR ZELLKULTUR, ZELLKULTURVERFAHREN DAMIT, ZELLKULTURGEFÄSS UND VERWENDUNG ALS SUBSTRAT | [2018/31] | English: | SUBSTRATE FOR CELL CULTURE, CELL CULTURE METHOD USING SAME, CELL CULTURE VESSEL, AND USE AS SUBSTRATE | [2018/31] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE UTILISANT CELUI-CI, CONTENANT DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE ET SON UTILISATION EN TANT QUE SUBSTRAT | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/28] | 08.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0226974 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4* claim 1 *; | [XI]EP0320348 (IN VITRO SCIENT PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * claims 1,2,20-24 * * column 5, lines 27-39 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]CN102533632B (BEAVER NANO TECHNOLOGY SUZHOU CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-12 * claim - * [I] 4,5; | [A] - S. RICHARD TURNER, "Development of amorphous copolyesters based on 1,4-cyclohexanedimethanol", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, US, (20040101), vol. 42, no. 23, doi:10.1002/pola.20460, ISSN 0887-624X, pages 5847 - 5852, XP055578316 [A] 1-11 * page 5849, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pola.20460 | International search | [A]JPH07156349 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-12 * , paragraph [0012] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JPH01199572 (IN BUITORO SCIENT PROD INC) [X] 1-3, 6-12 * , claims 1, 2, 20 to 23; page 5, lower left column, lines 8 to 18 & US 5010013 A claims 1, 2, 8 to 11; column 5, lines 14 to 23 & EP 320348 A1 & DE 3888642 T * [Y] 4-7; | [XY]CN102276866 (Beaver Biosciences(Guangzhou) Inc., Peop.Rep.China) [X] 1-3, 6-12 * , example 10 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]JP2002347107 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO) [Y] 4-7 * , abstract; claims (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015050936 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [Y] 4-7 * , abstract; claim 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS63196281 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 4-7 * , claims; page 3, upper left column, line 12 to upper right column, line 8 (Family: none) * | [XY] - KOLLER,MANFRED R. et al., "Tissue culture surface characteristics influence the expansion of human bone marrow cells", Biomaterials, (19980000), vol. 19, no. 21, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1963 - 1972, XP004161471 [X] 1-3, 6-12 [Y] 4-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(98)00101-X | [XY] - WANG,LIAN-CAI et al., "Synthesis of PTCG poly(ether ester)elastomer and preliminary biocompatible evaluation", Beijing Ligong Daxue Xuebao, (20041200), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 1001-0645, pages 454 - 457, XP002452215 [X] 1-3, 6-12 [Y] 4-7 |