EP3358621 - IMAGING ELEMENT AND IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Toru c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Satoshi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 03 /
ANDO, Ryoji c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 04 /
SEO, Takashi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 05 /
MATSUOKA, Yohei c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 06 /
WATANABE, Yoshiyuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851449.5 | 26.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP78279 | Priority number, date | JP20150195346 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015195346 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057278 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358621 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L27/14, H01L31/0232, H04N5/369, H04N5/374 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H01L27/14627 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,US);
H01L27/14623 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/1464 (EP,US);
H01L27/14645 (EP,US);
H01L27/14665 (KR);
H01L31/0232 (KR,US);
H04N25/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/76 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSELEMENT UND BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | IMAGING ELEMENT AND IMAGING DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'IMAGERIE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/27] | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2010230729 (ELLIS-MONAGHAN JOHN [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5-13 * paragraphs [0062] - [0069] * * figure 13 * [Y] 8-12; | [X]US2012188397 (OHTA KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,13 * paragraphs [0032] - [0087] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]WO2013065569 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,8-13 * paragraphs [0038] - [0048] ** figure 6 *; | [XY]US2015029374 (KITANO YOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,13 * paragraphs [0064] - [0074] - [ 107] - [0117] - [ 195] , [ 196] * * figures 1, 8, 26 * [Y] 8-12; | [XA]US2015035028 (FAN XIAOFENG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8-13 * paragraphs [0057] - [0062] * * figure 7 * [A] 6,7; | [X]US2015129943 (KATO NANAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8-13 * paragraphs [0054] - [0073] * * figures 2, 3 * | International search | [Y]JP2010212668 (IBM) [Y] 1-13* , paragraphs [0027] to [0067]; fig. 3 to 16 & US 2010/0230729 A1 paragraphs [0034] to [0074]; fig. 3 to 16 & CN 101834194 A & KR 10-2010-0102043 A *; | [XY]WO2014120447 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-7, 13 * , page 13, line 27 to page 17, line 31; page 39, lines 1 to 9; fig. 6 to 10, 22 & JP 2016-511539 A & US 2014/0211056 A1 & US 2014/0320718 A1 & US 2016/0043126 A1 & US 8773562 B1 & EP 2951864 A1 & AU 2014212829 A1 & KR 10-2015-0113133 A & CN 105009291 A & TW 201438207 A & TW 201622116 A * [Y] 8-13; | [XY]JP2015095468 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0059], [0070] to [0079], [0088]; fig. 1 to 4, 7 to 8 & US 2015/0129943 A1 paragraphs [0047] to [0077], [0088] to [0097], [0114] to [0115]; fig. 1 to 4, 7 to 8 & US 2016/0126266 A1 & CN 104637963 A * [Y] 1-13 |