EP3357494 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT AND/OR PROPHYLACTIC AGENT FOR PERIPHERAL NERVE DISORDER OR SPINAL INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNO, Kinji c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 02 /
ISHIGURO, Naoki c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 03 /
OKAWARA, Bisei c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 04 /
YAGI, Hideki c/o Japanese Red Cross Nagoya Daiichi Hospital 35, Michishita-cho, 3-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 453-8511 / JP | 05 /
OTA, Kyotaro c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851733.2 | 29.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP78801 | Priority number, date | JP20150193291 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015193291 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057562 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357494 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/423, A61P1/08, A61P1/10, A61P1/12, A61P9/00, A61P19/00, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P21/02, A61P25/02, A61P29/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/423 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHER WIRKSTOFF UND/ODER PROPHYLAKTISCHER WIRKSTOFF FÜR PERIPHERE NERVENSTÖRUNG ODER WIRBELSÄULENVERLETZUNGEN | [2018/32] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT AND/OR PROPHYLACTIC AGENT FOR PERIPHERAL NERVE DISORDER OR SPINAL INJURY | [2018/32] | French: | AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET/OU AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE POUR UN TROUBLE DES NERFS PÉRIPHÉRIQUES OU UNE LÉSION SPINALE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | Translation filed | 28.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004024096 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 6; claim - *; | [X] - B Battista, "Zonisamide administration for the treatment of diabetic peripheral neuropathy: Safety and efficacy", (20080101), URL: https://journals.lww.com/ejanaesthesiology/Fulltext/2008/05001/Zonisamide_administration_for_the_treatment_of.679.aspx#pdf-link, (20190415), XP055580915 [X] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00003643-200805001-00679 | [X] - SONYA J. SNEDECOR ET AL, "Systematic Review and Meta-Analysis of Pharmacological Therapies for Painful Diabetic Peripheral Neuropathy", PAIN PRACTICE, US, (20130328), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1111/papr.12054, ISSN 1530-7085, pages 167 - 184, XP055580902 [X] 1-12 * page 177 - page 178; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/papr.12054 | [X] - Aysel Atli ET AL, "PA I N M E D I C I N E Volume 6 @BULLET Number 3 @BULLET 2005 Zonisamide in the Treatment of Painful Diabetic NeuropathyAtli and Dogra Zonisamide in the Treatment of Painful Diabetic Neuropathy: A Randomized, Double-Blind, Placebo-Controlled Pilot Study", (20050101), URL: https://academic.oup.com/painmedicine/article-pdf/6/3/225/5199718/6-3-225.pdf, (20190415), XP055580894 [X] 1-12 * page 232 * | [X] - BACKONJA M-M, "USE OF ANTICONVULSANTS FOR TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN", NEURO, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (20020910), vol. 59, no. 5, SUPPL. 02, ISSN 0028-3878, pages S14 - S17, XP009042844 [X] 1-12 * page s16 * | International search | [X]JP2010527965 (Neurosearch A/S) [X] 1-7 * , claims 7, 13 & US 2010/0168192 A1 & WO 2008/142134 A1 claims 7, 13 & EP 2152679 A1 *; | [Y]WO9933465 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * , claims 1, 6; table 7 & US 6342515 B1 & EP 1040830 A1 paragraph [0022]; claims 1, 6 *; | [Y]JP2003012523 (OTSUKA YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraph [0003] (Family: none) * | [X] - TAKEHISA HIRAYAMA et al., "Wobbler Mouse no Sekizui Undo Neuron Shogai ni Taisuru zonisamide Ryoho no Kento", Neurological Therapeutics, (20120925), vol. 29, no. 5, page 670, XP 009509372 [X] 1-5 * , column of 3D-12 * | [X] - M TANABE et al., "Centrally mediated antihyperalgesic and antiallodynic effects of zonisamide following partial nerve injury in the mouse", Naunyn-Schmiedeberg's Arch Pharmacol, (20050000), vol. 372, pages 107 - 114, XP 019326097 [X] 1, 2, 6 | [X] - MASANOBU UCHIGATA, "Parkinson-byo Choki Chiryorei eno Zonisamide Tsuika Toyo ni yori, Shojo no Kaizen ga Erareta Ichi Shorei", Pharma Med, (20120410), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 85 - 88, XP009510119 [X] 1-3, 7 |