EP3358348 - QUENCHER CONTAINING WATER SOLUBLE POLYMER-CONJUGATED NANOMATERIAL AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lemonex Inc. Seoul National University 1 Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WON, Cheolhee 122C-501 SNU Faculty Apartment 1 Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | 02 /
MIN, Dal-Hee 122C-501 SNU Faculty Apartment 1 Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851971.8 | 15.06.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016KR06355 | Priority number, date | KR20150139174 | 02.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150139174 | [2018/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057823 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358348 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/58, C12N15/115, C08B37/00, G01N33/533, C12Q1/68 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C08B37/0021 (EP,US);
G01N33/5306 (CN,KR);
C12Q1/701 (CN);
G01N21/6428 (CN,US);
C01B32/23 (KR);
C08B37/00 (KR);
C08B37/003 (US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12N15/115 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6816 (CN);
C12Q1/6818 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (CN);
C12Q1/6886 (CN);
C12Q1/6888 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/689 (CN);
C12Q1/70 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (CN,KR);
G01N33/533 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (CN);
G01N33/56938 (CN);
G01N33/56983 (CN);
G01N33/574 (US);
G01N33/57484 (CN);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (CN,KR);
G01N33/6893 (CN);
A61K49/0017 (US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
C01P2004/62 (KR);
C12R2001/01 (CN);
C12R2001/445 (CN);
G01N2021/6432 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2563/107 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | G01N33/53, G01N33/58, C12N15/115, C08B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | LÖSCHER MIT WASSERLÖSLICHEM POLYMERKONJUGIERTEM NANOMATERIAL UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/32] | English: | QUENCHER CONTAINING WATER SOLUBLE POLYMER-CONJUGATED NANOMATERIAL AND USE THEREOF | [2018/32] | French: | EXTINCTEUR CONTENANT UN NANOMATÉRIAU CONJUGUÉ À UN POLYMÈRE SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU ET SON UTILISATION | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2018 | Translation filed | 27.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 27.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2022 | 11.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/41] | 04.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20140048008 (NAT CANCER CT [KR]) [X] 1-7,9,10,15,17-25 * Fig. 4 *; | [X]US2015080251 (MIN DAL-HEE [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13,15,17-22,25 * Fig. 1 *; | [X] - ZHENBAO LIU ET AL, "Fluorescent sensors using DNA-functionalized graphene oxide", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, DE, (20140702), vol. 406, no. 27, doi:10.1007/s00216-014-7888-3, ISSN 1618-2642, pages 6885 - 6902, XP055556566 [X] 1-8,10-13,15,17-25 * Abstract;p. 3870 "Preparation of the NGO-PEG/F-S1 nanocomplex";p. 3874, "Conclusions" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-014-7888-3 | [X] - XIANG-LING LI ET AL, "On-chip selective capture of cancer cells and ultrasensitive fluorescence detection of survivin mRNA in a single living cell", LAB ON A CHIP, (20130101), vol. 13, no. 19, doi:10.1039/c3lc50587a, ISSN 1473-0197, page 3868, XP055556572 [X] 1-13,15,17-22,25 * Abstract; p. 10905 "Measurement of thrombin based on PEG-coated GO" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3lc50587a | [X] - SHUAI ZHANG ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo behaviors of dextran functionalized graphene", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 49, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2011.05.056, ISSN 0008-6223, (20110530), pages 4040 - 4049, (20110602), XP028238699 [X] 1-8,10,15,17-22,25 * Abstract; Fig. 1(c) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2011.05.056 | [XP] - YALI XIE ET AL, "Determination of Lysozyme by Graphene Oxide-Polyethylene Glycol-Based Fluorescence Resonance Energy Transfer", ANALYTICAL LETTERS, US, (20160524), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1080/00032719.2016.1172232, ISSN 0003-2719, pages 148 - 160, XP055557046 [XP] 1-8,10-13,15-25 * Abstract; Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00032719.2016.1172232 | International search | [A]KR20130017271 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-25* See abstract; claim 1; figure 1. *; | [XY]KR20140014443 (NAT CANCER CT [KR]) [X] 1-9 * See abstract; claims 1-2, 8-9 and 11; paragraphs [0021] and [0026]; figure 1. * [Y] 10-25; | [Y]US2014100124 (WYLIE DENNIS [US], et al) [Y] 14 * See abstract; claims 1, 7 and 16; paragraph [0015]; table 8; sequence nos. 4, 6. *; | [A]KR20140119633 (IUCF HYU [KR]) [A] 1-25 * See abstract; claims 1 and 6. *; | [Y] - CHANG, H. et al., "Graphene Fluorescence Resonance Energy Transfer Aptasensor for the Thrombin Detection", Analytical Chemistry, (20100315), vol. 82, no. 6, pages 2341 - 2346, XP055386505 [Y] 10-25 * See abstract; page 2341, right column, paragraph [3]-page 2342, left column, paragraph [1]; page 2342, right column, paragraph [3]; diagram 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac9025384 |