EP3359767 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROL OF SPRING FORCE IN A DOOR CLOSER OR OPERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale Security Inc. 1902 Airport Road Monroe, NC 28112 / US | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZASOWESKI, Peter 137 County Road 1823 Yantis, TX 75497 / US | 02 /
LAWHON, Dustin 1665 Stanback Ferry Road Lilesville, NC 28091 / US | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2018/33] | Somervell, Thomas Richard Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16854120.9 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US54835 | Priority number, date | US201562237724P | 06.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562237724 P | US201615280014 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: US201615280014 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017062283 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359767 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3359767 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/10, E05F1/10, E05F3/00, E05F3/22 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
E05F1/105 (EP,US);
E05F3/10 (EP,US);
E05F3/102 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/499 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/818 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER FEDERKRAFT BEI EINEM TÜRSCHLIESSER ODER -BEDIENER | [2018/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROL OF SPRING FORCE IN A DOOR CLOSER OR OPERATOR | [2018/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE FORCE DE RESSORT DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT OU DE FERMETURE DE PORTE | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 05.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4590639 (FRITSCHE KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XAI]US5636678 (CARPER KENNETH E [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10 * column 14, line 44 - line 63; figures 9,15 * [A] 2-5,11-15 [I] 8,9; | [XAI]EP1887177 (SOMFY SAS [FR]) [X] 1,6,7,10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 * [A] 2-5,11-15 [I] 8,9 | International search | [Y]GB2180294 (NEWMAN TONKS ENG) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 12, 14-17, 19-22, 24, 25, 27 * entire document *; | [Y]US4686739 (FRITSCHE KARL [DE], et al) [Y] 14-16, 22 * entire document *; | [Y]GB2239290 (ANTHONY S MFG CO [US]) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 12, 14-17, 19-22, 24, 25, 27 * entire document *; | [A]US5802670 (BIENEK VOLKER [DE]) [A] 1-27* entire document *; | [A]US8732905 (BELL ROBERT MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-27 * entire document * | by applicant | US5636678 | EP1887177 | US8732905 |