EP3360062 - DYNAMIC SEARCH INPUT SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pinterest, Inc. 808 Brannan Street San Franciso, CA 94103 / US | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Kelei c/o Pinterest Inc. 808 Brannan Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
GAVINI, Naveen c/o Pinterest Inc. 808 Brannan Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 03 /
JING, Yushi c/o Pinterest Inc. 808 Brannan Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 04 /
ZHAI, Andrew Huan c/o Pinterest Inc. 808 Brannan Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 05 /
KISLYUK, Dmitry Olegovich c/o Pinterest Inc. 808 Brannan Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16854145.6 | 03.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US55212 | Priority number, date | US201514875010 | 05.10.2015 Original published format: US201514875010 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017062317 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360062 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/532 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06F16/5866 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (EP,US);
G06F16/538 (US);
G06F16/54 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F2203/04803 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/33] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE SUCHEINGABEAUSWAHL | [2018/33] | English: | DYNAMIC SEARCH INPUT SELECTION | [2018/33] | French: | SÉLECTION DYNAMIQUE D'ENTRÉE DE RECHERCHE | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2021 | 02.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/27] | 02.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.06.2021 | 03.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007286531 (FU HSIN CHIA [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0015] - [0018] - [0048] - [0049] - [0056] , [0058] , [0062] , [0072] - [0073] *; | [A]US2008226119 (CANDELORE BRANT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0019] - [0021] - [0024] , [0026] , [0038] - [0041] - [0045] - [0046] - [0054] , [0057] , [0060]; figure 2 *; | [XI]US2011128288 (PETROU DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0006] , [0044] , [0061] , [0112] , [0143] , [0162] - [0163] - [0167] , [0168] , [0170] , [0174]; figures 14, 15, 17A, 17B * [I] 9; | [A]US2015134688 (JING YUSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0016] - [0021] , [0024] - [0025] - [0034] - [0035] - [0040] - [0042] - [0051] *; | [A] - Ze-Lian Li ET AL, "Fundamentals of Multimedia - Content-Based Retrieval in Digital Libraries", Fundamentals of Multimedia, Pearson Prentice Hall, (20041231), pages 531 - 578, ISBN 978-0-13-127256-9, XP055575727 [A] 1-15 * page 531 - page 532 * * page 521; figure 18.8 * | International search | [Y]US7117519 (ANDERSON ERIC C [US], et al) [Y] 18 and 19* , col 8, In 7-22 *; | [Y]US8909563 (JING YUSHI [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3, 8, 16, 17, 18/(16-17) and 19/(16-17) * , entire document, especially col 3, In 55 - col 4, In 5; col 4, In 27-42; col 9, In 10-24 *; | [XY]US2015134688 (JING YUSHI [US], et al) [X] 1, 6-7, 15 * , entire document, especially para [0015], [0022]-[0025], [0054], [0059] * [Y] 2, 3, 8, 16-19 | by applicant | US2011128288 |