EP3359192 - COMBINATION THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacroGenics, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASSELLI, James 9704 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
WIGGINTON, Jon, Marc 9704 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
BONVINI, Ezio 11136 Powder Horn Drive Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 04 /
KOENIG, Scott 10901 Ralston Road Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16854320.5 | 06.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US55750 | Priority number, date | US201562239020P | 08.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562239020 P | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017062619 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3359192 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K35/04, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/39558 (IL,RU);
A61K39/395 (IL,KR);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US);
C07K2317/524 (IL,US);
C07K2317/526 (IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
C07K2317/72 (IL,US);
C07K2317/732 (IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/33] | A61K39/395, A61K35/04, C07K16/18, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | BA | 27.03.2018 | ME | 27.03.2018 | Validation states | MA | 27.03.2018 | MD | 27.03.2018 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2018/33] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2018/33] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010036959 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al); | [XY]WO2015095404 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2012294796 (JOHNSON LESLIE S [US], et al); | [Y]US2014341902 (MAECKER HEATHER [US], et al); |