EP3359307 - LIVE-CELL SEEDING METHOD FOR MICROARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of Arizona State University 1475 North Scottsdale Road Skysong Suite 200 Scottsdale, AZ 85257 / US | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSNER, Jacob 2524 S El Paradiso 12 Mesa, Arizona 85202 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Clifford 513 E. Erie Drive Tempe, Arizona 85282 / US | 03 /
GLENN, Honor 2202 N. 77th Place Mesa, Arizona 85207 / US | 04 /
LEE, Kristen 522 W. Monte Avenue Mesa, Arizona 85210 / US | 05 /
RICHARDS, Mark 13325 E. Jupiter Way Chandler, Arizona 85225 / US | 06 /
KELBAUSKAS, Laimonas 889 E. Stottler Dr. Gilbert, Arizona 85296 / US | 07 /
BUSSEY, Kimberly 4135 E. Pinto Lane Phoenix, Arizona 85050 / US | 08 /
MELDRUM, Deirdre PO Box 50175 Phoenix, Arizona 85076 / US | [2018/35] |
Former [2018/33] | 01 /
MESSNER, Jacob 2524 S El Paradiso 12 Mesa, Arizona 85202 / US | ||
02 /
ANDERSON, Clifford 513 E. Erie Drive Tempe, Arizona 85282 / US | |||
03 /
GLENN, Honor 2202 N. 77th Place Mesa, Arizona 85207 / US | |||
04 /
LEE, Kristen 522 W. Monte Avenue Mesa, Arizona 85210 / US | |||
05 /
RICHARDS, Mark 13310 E Juniper Way Chandler, Arizona 85225 / US | |||
06 /
KELBAUSKAS, Laimonas 889 E. Stottler Dr. Gilbert, Arizona 85296 / US | |||
07 /
BUSSEY, Kimberly 4135 E. Pinto Lane Phoenix, Arizona 85050 / US | |||
08 /
MELDRUM, Deirdre PO Box 50175 Phoenix, Arizona 85076 / US | Representative(s) | Ghirardi, Valeria, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via Strobel, 8 20133 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Spadaro, Marco, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via Strobel, 8 20133 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16854448.4 | 07.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US56058 | Priority number, date | US201562238298P | 07.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562238298 P | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017062807 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359307 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/32, C12M1/00, C12N5/071 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C12M23/12 (EP,US);
C12Q1/24 (US);
C12M1/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/56966 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | LEBENDZELLENBESIEDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MIKROARRAYS | [2018/33] | English: | LIVE-CELL SEEDING METHOD FOR MICROARRAYS | [2018/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENSEMENCEMENT DE CELLULES VIVANTES POUR MICRORÉSEAUX | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 03.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2018 | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008160539 (MURPHY CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * [0517];; figure 45 *; | [A]WO2010101708 (UNIV MAINE SYS BOARD TRUSTEES [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * [00130]-[00140];; figure 11 *; | [A]WO2011094572 (TAKAYAMA SHUICHI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 17, line 4 - line 24; figure 1d * * page 29, line 5 - line 15 * * page 30, line 21 - line 31 *; | [Y]WO2011103143 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 22, line 18 - page 24, line 6; figures 2,7 *; | [Y]US2013196435 (LEE LUKE P [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * [0042];; figures 1,3 *; | [T] - JACOB J. MESSNER ET AL, "Laser-fabricated cell patterning stencil for single cell analysis", BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20171201), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s12896-017-0408-8, XP055578724 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12896-017-0408-8 | International search | [A]US2006270032 (BHATIA SANGEETA N [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2008220516 (EDDINGTON DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2008220169 (KHADEMHOSSEINI ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [A]US2013196435 (LEE LUKE P [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A] - JAVAHERIAN et al., "A fast and accessible methodology for micro-patterning cells on standard culture substrates using ParafilmTM inserts", PLoS One, (20110607), vol. 6, no. e20909, pages 1 - 8, XP055371472 [A] 1-26 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0020909 |