EP3362047 - LOW DOSE ORAL DIPYRIDAMOLE COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drug Rediscovery Group Ltd Pekeris 4 7670204 Rehovot / IL | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Rogosnitzky, Moshe Yitzchak 37 9083800 Kiryat Yearmin / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGOSNITZKY Moshe Yitzchak 37 Kiryat Yearim 9083800 / IL | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Johanna Industrial Property Services GmbH Rosenweg 14 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 16855041.6 | 14.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016IB56151 | Priority number, date | US201562241771P | 15.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562241771 P | US201662325516P | 21.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662325516 P | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017064652 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3362047 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K31/505, A61K31/519, A61K47/10, A61P27/04, A61P29/02, A61P25/20, A61P15/10, A61P31/12, A61K9/00, A61K31/4045 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,KR,US);
A61P15/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4045, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2018/34] | A61K9/08, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K31/505, A61K31/519, A61K47/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGDOSIERTE ORALE DIPYRIDAMOLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/34] | English: | LOW DOSE ORAL DIPYRIDAMOLE COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE DIPYRIDAMOLE FAIBLEMENT DOSÉES À ADMINISTRATION ORALE ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 11.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 08.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN1279066 (YANAN HOSPITAL KUNMING CITY [CN]) [I] 1-5,12 * example 2 *; | [A] - BALAKUMAR PITCHAI ET AL, "Classical and pleiotropic actions of dipyridamole: Not enough light to illuminate the dark tunnel?", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (201409), vol. 87, ISSN 1043-6618, pages 144 - 150, XP055588614 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phrs.2014.05.008 | International search | [Y]US6586478 (ACKMAN C BRUCE [CA], et al) [Y] 6, 16, 29-30 * ; column 3, lines 9-35; column 8, lines 57-61; column 10, lines 46-50 *; | [XY]CN1586484 (RUIYIREN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOG [CN]) [X] 1, 3, 5, 28, 33, 36, 42 * (English translation); claims 1 and 7, page 2, second column, twelfth-thirteenth paragraphs; page 3, second column, fourth-fifth, seventh, and thirteenth paragraphs; page 4, third paragraph and embodiment 1 * [Y] 2, 19, 22, 29-32, 34-35, 37-41; | [Y]US2006211664 (DUDLEY ROBERT E [US]) [Y] 20, 34 * ; claim 9, paragraphs [0023], [0035], [0093] *; | [XY]US2006234991 (KEITH CURTIS [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 14, 24 * ; paragraph [0004], [0007]-[0008],[0013]-[0019], [0030], [0034]-[0035], [0038]-[0039], [0043] * [Y] 6, 15-23, 25-27, 29; | [Y]US2007021391 (DOI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 25, 39 * : paragraphs [0622], [0641] *; | [Y]CN1969947 (BEIJING QI YUAN YI PHARM RES [CN]) [Y] 18, 32 * (English translation); claim 1; page 3, second-third paragraphs *; | [X]US2007213308 (LESSEM JAN N [US], et al) [X] 7-14, 24 26, 38, 40 * ; paragraphs [0003], [0010], [0012], [0014], [0019], [0038], [0126], [0130]-[0133],[0136], [0211] *; | [Y]US2014107130 (TAMBI BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 2 * ; paragraphs [0004], [0007], [0014] *; | [Y]US2015031712 (ROGOSNITZKY MOSHE [IL]) [Y] 17, 31 * ; paragraphs [0049], [0076], [0097] *; | [Y]WO2015110923 (ACERTA PHARMA BV [NL]) [Y] 21, 35 * ; paragraphs [0013], [00262] *; | [Y] - COSTELLO RB et al., "The Effectiveness of Melatonin for Promoting Healthy Sleep: a Rapid Evidence Assessment of the Literature", Nutrition Journal, (20140000), vol. 13, no. 106, pages 1 - 17, XP 021203420 [Y] 6, 15, 29 * ; page 12, second column, last paragraph; page 13, second column, second paragraph; page 17, first column, second paragraph * | [Y] - CHEN L et al., "Antinociceptive Effect of Prostatic Acid Phosphatase in a Rat Model of Cancer-Induced Bone Pain", Pain Physician, (20130000), vol. 16, pages 533 - 546, XP 055395863 [Y] 23, 37 * ; page 541, second column, last paragraph; page 542, first column, last paragraph; page 534, first column, third paragraph; page 546, first column, last paragraph, second column, first paragraph * | [Y] - SINGH D et al., "Phase II Trial of 5-Fluorouracil, High-Dose Leucovorin Calcium, and Dipyridamole in Advanced Prostate Cancer", Journal of Cancer Research and Clinical Oncology, (19920000), vol. 119, no. 2, pages 117 - 120, XP009509360 [Y] 27, 41 * (abstract); abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01209667 | [Y] - FAGHIHI G et al., "Comparison of the Efficacy of Topical Minoxidil 5% and Adenosine 0.75% Solutions on Male Androgenetic Alopecia and Measuring Patient Satisfaction Rate", Acta Dermatovenerol Croat, (20130000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 155 - 159, XP 055523132 [Y] 26, 40 * ; page 156, first column, first paragraph; page 158, second column, first paragraph * |