EP3363837 - MULTI-COMPONENT COPOLYMER, RUBBER COMPOSITION, CROSSLINKED RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND RUBBER ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIKAWA, Yasuo c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16855117.4 | 11.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016JP04546 | Priority number, date | JP20150204962 | 16.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015204962 | [2018/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017064863 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3363837 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/00, C08K3/34, C08L9/00, B60C1/00, C08L53/02 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (US);
C08F236/06 (US);
C08F236/08 (US);
C08F297/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/34, C08L53/02 (US,EP);
C08L9/00, C08L53/02, C08K3/34 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2018/34] | C08F297/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTEN-COPOLYMER, KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERNETZTE KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND KAUTSCHUKARTIKEL | [2018/34] | English: | MULTI-COMPONENT COPOLYMER, RUBBER COMPOSITION, CROSSLINKED RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND RUBBER ARTICLE | [2018/34] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE MULTICOMPOSANT, COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC, COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC RÉTICULÉE, ET ARTICLE EN CAOUTCHOUC | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2156368 (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE) [A] 1-15* examples 1-2 *; | [XI]JP2005220313 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-11 * paragraph 38 * [I] 12-15; | [XI]EP2098363 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0159] * [I] 12-15; | [XI]US2012214929 (FISHBURN JAMES ROSS [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * table 1 * [I] 12-15; | [XI]EP2762505 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * tables 1-2 * [I] 12-15; | [XI] - ALFONSO AREVALILLO ET AL, "Thermo-mechanical properties linked to rheological features in high molecular weight SEBS copolymers: Effect of styrene content and ethylene/butylene proportion", POLYMER TESTING,, (20121001), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 849 - 854, XP002783656 [X] 1-11 * table 1 * [I] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymertesting.2012.06.007 | [XI] - HONG B K ET AL, "Effects of molecular weight of SEBS triblock copolymer on themorphology, impact strength, and rheological property of syndiotacticpolystyrene/ethylene-propylene rubber blends", POLYMER,, (20000301), vol. 41, no. 6, doi:HTTPS://DOI.ORG/10.1016/S0032-3861(99)00372-9, pages 2069 - 2079, XP002783627 [X] 1-11 * table 1 * [I] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(99)00372-9 | [A] - MOTOMATSU M ET AL, "Microphase domains of poly(styrene-block-ethylene/butylene-block-styrene) triblock copolymers studied by atomic force microscopy", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (19970401), vol. 38, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0032-3861(96)00725-2, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 1779 - 1785, XP004056019 [A] 1-15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(96)00725-2 | International search | [X]JPS6112712 (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE) [X] 1-6, 8, 9, 11-15 * , claims; example 1 & GB 2156368 A claims; example 1 & DE 3510624 A & FR 2562079 A & BE 902035 A & CH 662574 A *; | [X]JPH07216037 (POLYSAR RUBBER CORP) [X] 1-6, 8, 9, 11-15 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0032], [0033], [0049], [0050]; example 6; table II & US 5260383 A claims; column 1, lines 5 to 20; column 7, lines 4 to 29; column 11, lines 14 to 60; example 6; table II & EP 509357 A1 & DE 69211215 C *; | [A]JPH09118811 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-15 * , claims; example 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH1180269 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-15* , claims & US 6310164 B1 claims & EP 891993 A1 & DE 69813958 D & CN 1206017 A & KR 10-0299078 B1 *; | [A]JP2002003553 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2005220313 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-10, 12-15 * , claims; paragraphs [0015] to [0022]; examples & US 2005/0119399 A1 claims; paragraphs [0049] to [0087]; examples & EP 1535959 A2 & CN 1629214 A * |