EP3364145 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM STORED ON COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM FOR PROVIDING VIRTUAL PLAYER IN DART GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hong International Corp. 306 111 Digital-ro 26-gil Guro-gu Seoul 08390 / KR | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Sang Uk 1701, 19 Yeongdong-daero 142-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06075 / KR | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16855654.6 | 04.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016KR11061 | Priority number, date | KR20150142103 | 12.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150142103 | [2018/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017065437 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364145 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F41J3/02, F41J3/00, F41J5/04, A63F13/65, A63F13/837 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
A63F13/837 (EP,US);
A63F13/65 (US);
A63F13/214 (EP);
A63F13/245 (EP);
A63F13/35 (EP);
F41J3/00 (US);
F41J3/0028 (EP);
F41J3/02 (EP,US);
F41J5/04 (EP,US);
F41J5/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND AUF EINEM COMPUTERLESBAREN MEDIUM GESPEICHERTES COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES VIRTUELLEN SPIELERS IN EINEM DARTSPIEL | [2018/34] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM STORED ON COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM FOR PROVIDING VIRTUAL PLAYER IN DART GAME | [2018/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR MÉMORISÉ SUR UN SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR LA FOURNITURE D'UN JOUEUR VIRTUEL DANS UNE PARTIE DE JEU DE FLÉCHETTES | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2018 | Translation filed | 12.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 12.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20040013864 (INTELLIX CORP LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * See abstract, claim 1 and figures 1-4. *; | [A]KR20070062658 (HONG SANG WOOK [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0056], [0061], [0117]-[0119] and figures 1-3, 11. *; | [A]KR100970678B (GOLFZON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0026], [0034]-[0042] and figures 1-6. *; | [A]KR20110021069 (HONG SANG WOOK [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0058] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR20140131081 (HONG INT CORP [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See abstract, claim 1 and figure 6. *; | [A] - VSPHOENIXS, "Transcending Reality", SUMMER FESTIVAL 2015 (Samafes 2015); 2015.8.8-9, (20150000), pages 1 - 6, XP009510303 [A] 1-9 * See pages 1-6. ?The document is considered a document declaring exceptions to lack of novelty by the applicant. * |