EP3365269 - CRISPR-CAS9 DELIVERY TO HARD-TO-TRANSFECT CELLS VIA MEMBRANE DEFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Methodist Hospital 6565 Fannin Street, MS D200 Houston, Texas 77030 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIN, Lidong 3215 Blue Bonnet Boulevard Houston, TX 77025 / US | 02 /
HAN, Xin 4045 Linkwood Drive Apt 216 Houston, TX 77025 / US | 03 /
LIU, Zongbin 2250 Holly Hall Street Apt 2102 Houston, TX 77054 / US | 04 /
MA, Yuan 7675 Phoenix Drive Apt 303 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Kai 6565 Fannin Street MS-D200 Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Küchler, Stefan Stefan T. Küchler Patentanwalt Färberstraße 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Küchler, Stefan Patentanwalt Färberstrasse 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16858105.6 | 19.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US57639 | Priority number, date | US201562243275P | 19.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562243275 P | US201562252337P | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252337 P | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070169 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365269 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B81B1/00, C12M1/00, C12N15/87, C12M1/42, B01L3/00, C12N15/90 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C12M35/04 (EP,US);
B01L3/50273 (US);
B01L3/502746 (US);
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
C12N15/907 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0636 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | B81B1/00, C12M1/00, C12N15/87 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | CRISPR-CAS9-ABGABE AN SCHWER ZU TRANSFIZIERENDE ZELLEN DURCH MEMBRANVERFORMUNG | [2018/35] | English: | CRISPR-CAS9 DELIVERY TO HARD-TO-TRANSFECT CELLS VIA MEMBRANE DEFORMATION | [2018/35] | French: | DISTRIBUTION, PAR DÉFORMATION MEMBRANAIRE, DE CRISPR-CAS9 À DES CELLULES DIFFICILES À TRANSFECTER | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 18.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013059343 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * pages 28-29 * * page 17, line 20 - line 26; claim 11 * * page 6, line 18 - line 19 *; | [A]WO2015023982 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015061458 (CELLANYX DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XDI] - X. HAN ET AL, "CRISPR-Cas9 delivery to hard-to-transfect cells via membrane deformation", SCIENCE ADVANCES, (20150814), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.1126/sciadv.1500454, pages e1500454 - e1500454, XP055339291 [XD] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * * page 3, column 8; figure 1 * * page 3, column 2 * * page 2, column 1 * [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/sciadv.1500454 | [XI] - XIN HAN ET AL, "Supplementary material for: CRISPR-Cas9 delivery to hard-to-transfect cells via membrane deformation", SCIENCE ADVANCES, (20150801), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.1126/sciadv.1500454, page e1500454, XP055587982 [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/sciadv.1500454 | [A] - A. SHAREI ET AL, "A vector-free microfluidic platform for intracellular delivery", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US, (20130122), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:10.1073/pnas.1218705110, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2082 - 2087, XP055551255 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1218705110 | [A] - ARMON SHAREI ET AL, "Cell Squeezing as a Robust, Microfluidic Intracellular Delivery Platform", JOURNAL OF VISUALIZED EXPERIMENTS, (20131107), no. 81, doi:10.3791/50980, XP055182930 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3791/50980 | International search | [Y]WO2015023982 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 26, 65 * Especially para [0005], [0022], [0023] *; | [Y]WO2015061458 (CELLANYX DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [Y] 33, 69* Especially para [0012], [0016], [0069], Fig 2 *; | [XY] - HAN et al., "CRISPR-Cas9 delivery to hard-to-transfect cells via membrane deformation.", Sci Adv., vol. 1, no. 7, (20150814), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://advances.sciencemag.org/highwire/filestream/186449/field_highwire_adjunct_files/0/1500454_SM.pdf, XP055339291 [X] 1-25, 27-32, 34-64, 66-68 * Especially abstract, pg 1 col 2 para 1, pg 2 col 1 para 1, pg 2 col 1 para 2 - pg 2 col 2 para 1, pg 4 col 1 para 1, pg 6 col 2 para 2, pg 7 col 1 para 2, pg 7 col 1 para 3, Fig 1A, Fig 1B, Fig 1C, Fig S1A * [Y] 26, 33, 65, 69 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/sciadv.1500454 |