EP3369755 - GRAFT COPOLYMER, CROSSLINKED PARTICLES, GRAFT CROSSLINKED PARTICLES, RUBBERY POLYMER AND THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techno-UMG Co., Ltd. 1-9-2, Higashi-Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states UMG ABS, Ltd. 8-1, Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-6591 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWANAGA, Takashi c/o Ube Plant UMG ABS Ltd. 525-14 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | 02 /
NAITO, Yoshitaka c/o Ube Plant UMG ABS Ltd. 525-14 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | 03 /
ATSUTA, Hiroyuki c/o Ube Plant UMG ABS Ltd. 525-14 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | 04 /
KAMATA, Ichiro c/o Ube Plant UMG ABS Ltd. 525-14 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | 05 /
MATSUYAMA, Hironori c/o Ube Plant UMG ABS Ltd. 525-14 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | 06 /
FUKAMACHI, Yuusuke c/o Ube Plant UMG ABS Ltd. 525-14 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16859531.2 | 07.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016JP79919 | Priority number, date | JP20150212024 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015212024 | JP20150212025 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015212025 | JP20150212026 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015212026 | JP20150212027 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015212027 | [2018/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017073294 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369755 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08F291/02, C08F2/22, C08F2/44, C08F20/20, C08F279/00, C08L51/06, C08L101/00, C08F212/10, C08F220/14, C08F283/12, C08F285/00, C08L25/12, C08L33/12, C08L51/08 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C08F2/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08F291/02 (KR);
C08F220/18 (CN);
C08F2/24 (US);
C08F2/26 (CN);
C08F2/44 (EP,US);
C08F20/20 (EP,US);
C08F212/10 (EP,US);
C08F220/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F265/04 (CN);
C08F279/00 (KR);
C08F279/02 (US);
C08F283/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F285/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08F290/061 (CN);
C08F290/062 (CN);
C08G81/024 (US);
C08J3/07 (US);
C08J3/24 (US);
C08K5/0025 (US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08L33/12 (CN,US);
C08L51/003 (US);
C08L51/02 (KR);
C08L51/04 (KR);
C08L51/06 (KR);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C08L51/085 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (US);
C08L83/10 (US);
C08F2/56 (US);
C08F220/1804 (US);
C08F257/02 (US);
C08F265/06 (US);
C08L2312/00 (US);
C08L55/02 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/14, C08F222/40, C08F212/08 (US,KR,CN,EP);
C08F265/04, C08F212/08 (US);
C08F265/04, C08F212/10 (CN);
C08F283/12, C08F2/26 (CN);
C08F283/12, C08F220/1804 (US,EP);
C08F283/12, C08F220/40 (US);
C08F285/00, C08F212/08 (US,EP,CN);
C08F285/00, C08F220/14 (US,EP,CN);
C08F285/00, C08F220/44 (US,EP,CN);
C08F290/061, C08F212/10 (CN);
C08F290/062, C08F212/10 (CN);
C08L25/12, C08L51/003 (CN);
C08L25/12, C08L51/085 (US,EP,CN);
C08L33/12, C08L51/085 (CN); |
Former IPC [2018/36] | C08F291/02, C08F2/22, C08F2/44, C08F20/20, C08F279/00, C08L51/06, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | PFROPFCOPOLYMER, VERNETZTE TEILCHEN, PFROPFVERNETZTE TEILCHEN, KAUTSCHUKARTIGES POLYMER UND THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2018/36] | English: | GRAFT COPOLYMER, CROSSLINKED PARTICLES, GRAFT CROSSLINKED PARTICLES, RUBBERY POLYMER AND THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION USING SAME | [2018/36] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE GREFFÉ, PARTICULES RÉTICULÉES, PARTICULES RÉTICULÉES GREFFÉES, POLYMÈRE CAOUTCHOUTEUX ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMOPLASTIQUE LES UTILISANT | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2018 | Translation filed | 25.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 25.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19837854 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 13-17* claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO0174943 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 13-17 * page 4, line 5 - line 46; claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO03064486 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [X] 13-15 * page 1, line 5 - line 11; examples 1, 2; claims 1-67 *; | [X]EP1369455 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0185] - [1094]; claims 1-32; tables 1-1, 2-1, 2-2, 2-3, 2-4, 2-5, 2-6 *; | [X]US2004249069 (NAKAI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * claims 1-13; tables 1-4 *; | [X]EP1826241 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1-21; tables 1-5 *; | [E]EP3231826 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 4-8,18 * paragraphs [0035] , [ 0039] , [ 0059] , [ 0060]; claims 1-19 * | International search | [A]JPS56120751 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [A] 8-28 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [X]JPS5951906 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 29-37 * , claims; page 2, upper right column, line 16 to lower left column, line 6; page 2, lower left column, line 16 to lower right column, line 18; page 2, lower right column, line 19 to page 3, upper right column, line 2; page 3, lower left column, line 18 to lower right column, line 10; page 4, upper left column, line 11 to lower left column, line 1; page 4, lower left column, lines 2 to 11 (Family: none) *; | [X]JPS6227410 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 8, 10-13, 19-20, 22-23 * , claims; page 3, upper left column, line 10 to upper right column, line 6; page 3, lower left column, lines 2 to 20; page 4, upper left column, line 20 to lower left column, line 20; examples & US 4803252 A claims 1 to 2; examples *; | [X]JPS6248715 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 8, 10-12, 19-20, 22 * , claims; page 3, upper right column, line 9 to lower left column, line 6; page 4, lower right column, lines 3 to 13 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH03223308 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 8-28 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09505625 (W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.) [A] 29-37 * , claims 1 to 11 & WO 1995/014715 A1 claims 1 to 12 & EP 730610 A1 & DE 69416856 C & DE 69416856 T & AU 7970694 A *; | [Y]JP2002020443 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [Y] 6 * , claims 1 to 8; paragraph [0003]; examples (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2005307073 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1-7 * , claims 1 to 6; paragraphs [0010], [0017], [0021] to [0025] (Family: none) * [Y] 6; | [X]JP2007162016 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 29-32, 34 * , claims 1 to 3; paragraphs [0012] to [0014], [0017]; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008120943 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 29-37* , claims 1 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014034656 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1-7 * , claims 1 to 4 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS59232138 | JPH01190746 | JPH04225051 | JPH08134312 | JP2000344841 | JP2002080684 | JP2004346187 | JP2005132970 | JP2011178831 | JP2012144714 | JP2015212025 | JP2015212026 | JP2015212027 | JP20150212024 |