EP3365911 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOADING A SUBSTRATE INTO A VACUUM PROCESSING MODULE, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF A SUBSTRATE FOR A VACUUM DEPOSITION PROCESS IN A VACUUM PROCESSING MODULE, AND SYSTEM FOR VACUUM PROCESSING OF A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, John M. 28530 Hayward Blvd. Hayward, California 94542 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16860416.3 | 28.04.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US29721 | Priority number, date | US201562246095P | 25.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562246095 P | US201562246401P | 26.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562246401 P | US201562252900P | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252900 P | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074503 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365911 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/683, C23C14/56, C23C16/54 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
H01J37/3452 (EP,US);
C23C14/042 (KR,US);
C23C14/24 (US);
C23C14/3407 (US);
C23C14/35 (KR,US);
C23C14/352 (EP,US);
C23C14/50 (KR,US);
C23C14/564 (US);
C23C14/566 (EP,US);
C23C14/568 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/54 (EP,US);
H01J37/32724 (US);
H01J37/32779 (US);
H01J37/3405 (EP,US);
H01J37/3411 (US);
H01J37/3417 (US);
H01J37/342 (EP,US);
H01J37/3423 (EP,US);
H01J37/345 (EP,US);
H01L21/67 (US);
H01L21/6838 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | H01L21/203, H01L21/67 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN EINES SUBSTRATS IN EIN VAKUUMVERARBEITUNGSMODUL, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS FÜR EINEN VAKUUMABSCHEIDUNGSPROZESS IN EINEM VAKUUMVERARBEITUNGSMODUL UND SYSTEM ZUR VAKUUMVERARBEITUNG EINES SUBSTRATS | [2018/35] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOADING A SUBSTRATE INTO A VACUUM PROCESSING MODULE, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF A SUBSTRATE FOR A VACUUM DEPOSITION PROCESS IN A VACUUM PROCESSING MODULE, AND SYSTEM FOR VACUUM PROCESSING OF A SUBSTRATE | [2018/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT DANS UN MODULE DE TRAITEMENT SOUS VIDE, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT POUR UN PROCESSUS DE DÉPÔT SOUS VIDE DANS UN MODULE DE TRAITEMENT SOUS VIDE, ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT SOUS VIDE D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 16.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6113698 (RAAIJMAKERS IVO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,15 * col. 4, l. 16-32 col. 8, l. 46-53 col. 10, l. 8-23;; figure 3 * [I] 7; | [XI]US6585478 (WOOD ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,15 * col. 2, l. 3-32 col. 3, l. 24-59;; figures 2-5 *[I] 7; | [XI]US2008025835 (LILJEROOS JUHA PAUL [FI]) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0033] , [0038] * [I] 7; | [XI]US2009087932 (KONDOH KEISUKE [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,10,15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] , [0 14] , [0 16] , [0 34] , [0 57]; figures 2,4 * [I] 7,11 | International search | [A]US2001000759 (DOLEY ALLAN [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 12-15* See abstract, paragraphs [0036], [0037], claim 1 and figure 2. *; | [A]US6585478 (WOOD ERIC R [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 12-15 * See abstract, column 2, lines 2-62, claim 1 and figures 2, 3. *; | [X]US2008025835 (LILJEROOS JUHA PAUL [FI]) [X] 1-5, 12-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0001], [0011], [0012], [0026]-[0030], claims 1, 3 and figure 2A. *; | [A]US2013108378 (LEE MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-5, 12-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0039], [0040], claim 4 amd figures 5-7. *; | [A]JP2015115376 (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD) [A] 1-5, 12-15 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0048], claim 1 and figure 2. * |