EP3368615 - COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR WOOD CONCRETE BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states The Sherwin-Williams Headquarters Company 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | ||
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states The Sherwin-Williams Company 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | ||
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states The Valspar Corporation 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | ||
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Engineered Polymer Solutions, Inc. 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | ||
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. P.O. Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, Gregory, B PO Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | 02 /
MITTELSTEADT, John PO Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Chyung-Mei PO Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | 04 /
LIEU, D., Michelle PO Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16860626.7 | 25.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US58676 | Priority number, date | US201562248394P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248394 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074945 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368615 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/00, C04B41/52, C04B41/71, C04B41/45, B05D7/00, C09D133/08, // B05D3/02 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B05D7/51 (EP,US);
C04B41/483 (US);
B05D3/002 (US);
B05D3/101 (US);
B32B27/38 (EP,US);
B32B9/04 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/63 (US);
C04B41/71 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C09D133/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B18/26, C04B28/02 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/483, C04B41/502 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/483, C04B41/502, C04B41/522 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4853, C04B41/502 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4853, C04B41/502, C04B41/522 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5016, C04B41/522 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2018/36] | C09D5/00, B05D3/00, B32B9/04, B32B27/38, C08L63/00, C09D133/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR HOLZBETONBOHLE | [2018/36] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR WOOD CONCRETE BOARD | [2018/36] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PANNEAU EN BÉTON DE BOIS | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 25.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007269660 (KILLILEA T H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0086] , [0098]; examples 1-5 * [Y] 9 [I] 9,12; | [Y]CN100473703C (HERCULES INC [US]) [Y] 5 * page 11 ** page 38, line 15 - line 17 *; | [IY]WO2010019825 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0055] , [0069]; examples 1-14; claims 1-31 * [Y] 5,9; | [XDYI]US8202581 (VETTER GLEN O [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,8,10,12,14,15 * claim 13; tables 1,2 * [Y] 5,9 [I] 13; | [X]WO2014202724 (IGP PULVERTECHNIK AG [CH]) [X] 15 * page 2, line 25 - line 30 * * page 19, line 23 - page 20, line 3; claims 1,11,14,18 * | International search | [XY]US2007269660 (KILLILEA T H [US], et al) [X] 1, 10-12, 25 * [0004],[0005],[0021],[0030],[0043],Examples 1, 5 [0030], [0043], [0069] * [Y] 19; | [XY]US2008199725 (VETTER GLEN OTTO [US], et al) [X] 1-9, 13-18, 20-25 * [0006], [0017], [0020], [0033], [0039], [0040], [0042], [0044], [0052] [0006], [0017], [0020], [003 3 ], [0039], [0040], [0042], [0044], [0052] * [Y] 19; | [XY]WO2010019825 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 13-18, 20, 25 * [0004],[0005],[0031],[0055],[0069],Example 5 [0004],[0005],[0031],[0055],[0069],Example 5 *[Y] 19 |