EP3369058 - GENERATING RTSM SYSTEMS FOR CLINICAL TRIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4G CLINICAL LLC 370 Washington Street Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOURTELLOTTE, Edward Alan 21A Farm Street Dover, MA 02030 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | do Nascimento Gomes, Rui J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Vítor Cordon, 10-A 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | do Nascimento Gomes, Rui J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Vitor Cordon, 14 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 16860708.3 | 26.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US58913 | Priority number, date | US201562246210P | 26.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562246210 P | US201662279243P | 15.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662279243 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017075083 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369058 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q50/22, G06F17/27, G16H10/20, G16H50/20 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G16H10/20 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/243 (EP,IL,US);
G06N7/01 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | G06Q10/10, G06Q50/22, G06F17/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON RTSM-SYSTEMEN FÜR KLINISCHE STUDIEN | [2018/36] | English: | GENERATING RTSM SYSTEMS FOR CLINICAL TRIALS | [2018/36] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE SYSTÈMES DE RANDOMISATION ET DE GESTION DE FOURNITURE D'ESSAIS (RTSM) POUR ESSAIS CLINIQUES | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011307267 (YOUNG BENJAMIN [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0108] ** paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0168] * | International search | [YA]US2002007358 (JOHNSON DAVID E [US], et al) [Y] 10-11 * , paragraphs [0021], [0025], [0029], [0033] * [A] 7-8; | [Y]US2002052702 (KELLER KEVIN A [US]) [Y] 17 * , paragraph [0032] *; | [XYA]US2011307267 (YOUNG BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 9, 12-16 * , figs 11&14B paragraphs [0050], [0054], [0059]-[0062], [0101]-[0102], [0148], [0151],[0156]-[0157], [0168]-[0169] * [Y] 10-11, 17 [A] 7-8; | [A]US2014019116 (LUNDBERG SONJA PETROVIC [SE], et al) [A] 1-17* , paragraphs [0112], [0149], [0156], [0170], [0181]-[0182] * |