EP3363234 - RATE ASSIGNMENT WITH RATE SPLITTING FOR INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION FRIENDLY NEW AIR INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1 Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-chu City 300 / TW | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Chien-Hwa No.255 Guangming 9th Rd. Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 / TW | 02 /
TSAI, Lung-Sheng No.176 Sec. 2 Zhongyi Rd. West Central Dist. Tainan City 700 / TW | 03 /
LIAO, Yi-Ju 1F. No.40 Ln. 73 Wuling Rd., North Dist. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 04 /
YU, Tsang-Wei 11F. No.45 Sec. 2 Jiafeng 6th Rd., Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 / TW | 05 /
LIAO, Pei-Kai No. 2 9th Neighborhood Wushuang Lane Mingjian Xiang Nantou County 551 / TW | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstraße 2 81679 München / DE | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 16861603.5 | 04.11.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016CN104622 | Priority number, date | US201562251787P | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562251787 P | US201615341846 | 02.11.2016 Original published format: US201615341846 | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017076335 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3363234 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/22 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04J11/00 (US);
H04L1/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0048 (EP,US);
H04L25/0202 (US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/0066 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RATENZUWEISUNG MIT RATENTEILUNG FÜR INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNGSFREUNDLICHE NEUE LUFTSCHNITTSTELLE | [2018/34] | English: | RATE ASSIGNMENT WITH RATE SPLITTING FOR INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION FRIENDLY NEW AIR INTERFACE | [2018/34] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE DÉBIT À DIVISION DE DÉBIT POUR UNE NOUVELLE INTERFACE RADIO ADAPTÉE À UNE ANNULATION DE BROUILLAGE | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 18.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |