EP3372439 - MOBILE BODY USING REMOVABLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANMA, Tomosada c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Shinji c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
TAKANO, Masakazu c/o YAMAHA MOTOR ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 3622-8 Nishikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0026 / JP | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 16861794.2 | 28.04.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016JP63435 | Priority number, date | JP20150215901 | 02.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015215901 | [2018/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017077725 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372439 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L11/18, B60L15/20, B62M7/12, H02H5/04, H02J7/00 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
B60L3/00 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L3/0038 (US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
B60L58/25 (EP);
B62M7/12 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (US);
H02H5/04 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (EP,US);
H02J7/0031 (US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (US);
H01R13/6683 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | MOBILES GEHÄUSE MIT HERAUSNEHMBARER BATTERIE | [2018/37] | English: | MOBILE BODY USING REMOVABLE BATTERY | [2018/37] | French: | CORPS MOBILE UTILISANT UNE BATTERIE AMOVIBLE | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2018 | Translation filed | 02.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 02.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015127206 (TSUJI SHINJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0074] * * figures 1-10 *; | [I]EP2423033 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] - [0007] - [0 11] , [0 24] - [0034] - [0 37] , [0 38] , [0042] - [0045] - [0 49] - [0056] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]JP2004279668 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011139572 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH08171942 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]US2013169261 (FENDT GUENTER ANTON [DE], et al) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0003], [0049] to [0061]; fig. 1 & WO 2012/004302 A1 & EP 2591374 A & DE 102010026435 A & KR 10-2013-0030821 A * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]JP2011139572 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 2-15 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0049]; fig. 3 to 6 & CN 102111001 A *; | [A]JP2011054342 (LENOVO SINGAPORE PTE LTD) [A] 1-15 * , abstract; fig. 1 to 3 & US 2011/0050175 A1 abstract; fig. 1B to 3 & CN 102005733 A * |