EP3355341 - CURABLE RESIN FILM AND FIRST PROTECTIVE FILM FORMING SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Hon-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO Akinori c/o LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGISHI Masanori c/o LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16862110.0 | 02.11.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016JP82539 | Priority number, date | JP20150217108 | 04.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015217108 | [2018/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017078050 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355341 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/301, B32B7/02, H01L21/56, H01L23/12, H01L21/78, H01L23/29 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H01L21/6835 (EP);
H01L21/56 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/3171 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (KR,US);
B32B27/308 (KR,US);
B32B27/32 (KR,US);
B32B27/36 (KR,US);
B32B27/38 (KR,US);
C08L33/08 (US);
C08L63/00 (US);
C09J7/385 (US);
H01L21/561 (US);
H01L21/78 (US);
H01L23/00 (EP,US);
H01L23/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/293 (KR,US);
H01L24/12 (KR,US);
H01L24/94 (KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2457/14 (US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
C08L2205/035 (US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP);
H01L2221/6834 (EP);
H01L2224/12105 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | H01L21/301, B32B7/02, H01L21/56, H01L23/00, H01L23/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE HARZFOLIE UND ERSTER SCHUTZFOLIENFORMBOGEN | [2018/31] | English: | CURABLE RESIN FILM AND FIRST PROTECTIVE FILM FORMING SHEET | [2018/31] | French: | FILM DE RÉSINE DURCISSABLE ET FEUILLE DE FORMATION DE PREMIER FILM DE PROTECTION | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | Translation filed | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP5242830B (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [I] 1,2* paragraphs [0001] , [ 0008] , [ 0010] , [ 0022] , [ 0023] , [ 0028] * | International search | [A]JP2010073816 (LINTEC CORP) [A] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0012], [0017]; table 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013211439 (LINTEC CORP) [A] 1, 2* , paragraphs [0017], [0035] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014075215 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1, 2 * , paragraph [0053]; table 2 (Family: none) * |