EP3373469 - METHOD FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUM, Kunil IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jonghyun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kijun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16862354.4 | 31.10.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016KR12338 | Priority number, date | US201562250489P | 03.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562250489 P | US201562256693P | 17.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256693 P | US201562257225P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257225 P | US201562257621P | 19.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257621 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017078338 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373469 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/0417, H04B7/04 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B7/0621 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP,US);
H04B7/0643 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | H04B7/06, H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MELDUNG DES KANALSTATUS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/37] | English: | METHOD FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2018/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ VISANT À RENDRE COMPTE D'UN D'ÉTAT DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2018 | Translation filed | 04.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011013719 (TAOKA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 2, 3, 5, 6 *; | [A]EP2439997 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0069] ** figures 3, 5, 8, 11 *; | [I]EP2894920 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] * * figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US2013028182 (GEIRHOFER STEFAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0112]-[0150]; and figures 13-17. *; | [A]KR20150039746 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0224]-[0250]: and figures 17, 18. *; | [A]KR20150060916 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-12* See paragraphs [0081]-[0134]; and Figure 1. *; | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on Aperiodic CSI-RS Resource Configuration for Class B CSI Reporting", R1-155482, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #82bis, (20150925), XP051002387 [A] 1-12 * See section 2. * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Aperiodic CSl Related Enhancement for Rel-13 CA", R1-155378, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #82bis, (20150925), XP051002285 [A] 1-12 * See section 2. * |