EP3371326 - LIGASE-ASSISTED NUCLEIC ACID CIRCULARIZATION AND AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Life Sciences Solutions Operations UK Ltd 19 Jessops Riverside 800 Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [2020/33] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLER, Ryan Charles 1 Research Circle K1-5D41 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
KVAM, Erik Leeming 1 Research Circle K1-3A59 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 03 /
NELSON, John Richard 1 Research Circle K1-3A59 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Bannan, Sally Cytiva Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [2023/44] |
Former [2018/37] | Aldenbäck, Ulla Christina, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 16862774.3 | 01.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016US59835 | Priority number, date | US201514933275 | 05.11.2015 Original published format: US201514933275 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017079114 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371326 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371326 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6844, C12P19/34 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
C12P19/34 (EP);
C12Q1/6844 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2531/125 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIGASE-UNTERSTÜTZTE NUKLEINSÄUREZIRKULARISATION UND -AMPLIFIKATION | [2018/37] | English: | LIGASE-ASSISTED NUCLEIC ACID CIRCULARIZATION AND AMPLIFICATION | [2018/37] | French: | CIRCULARISATION ET AMPLIFICATION D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE ASSISTÉES PAR LIGASE | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 20.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010094040 (EPICT TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al)[A] 1-29; | [I] - ATHANASIOS TSAFTARIS ET AL, "Rolling circle amplification of genomic templates for inverse PCR (RCA-GIP): a method for 5' and 3'-genome walking without anchoring", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20090917), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 157 - 161, XP019766772 [I] 1,4,6,8-29 * page 159, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * | [A] - WANG G ET AL, "DNA amplification method tolerant to sample degradation", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (20040101), vol. 14, doi:10.1101/GR.2813404, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 2357 - 2366, XP002391762 [A] 1-29 * page 2363, column r, paragraph l - page 2364, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.2813404 | [A] - NUNEZ ET, "Application of Circular Ligase to Provide Template for Rolling Circle Amplification of Low Amounts of Fragmented DNA", (20100331), pages 1 - 7, 19TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HUMAN IDENTIFICATION - 2008,, URL: http://www.promega.com/~/media/files/resources/conference%20proceedings/ishi%2019/oral%20presentations/nunez.pdf?la=en, XP008153466 [A] 1-29 | International search | [Y]US2006134631 (KROKAN HANS E [NO], et al) [Y] 26, 27 * . Especially para [0006]. *; | [XY]US2015031086 (HELLER RYAN CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-25, 28 * ; Especially para [0005], [0006], [0020], [0032], [0037], [0038], [0042], [0044], [0045], [0050], [0059], [0063], [0072] * [Y] 26, 27, 29; | [Y]WO2015022359 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [Y] 29* . Especially para [0007] * | Examination | - CABRAL-NETO J B ET AL, "Implication of uracil in spontaneous mutagenesis on a single-stranded shuttle vector replicated in mammalian cells", MUTATION RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 288, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0027-5107(93)90091-S, ISSN 0027-5107, (19930801), pages 249 - 255, (19930801), XP023423943 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0027-5107(93)90091-S | by applicant | US2015031086 | - Biotechnol Lett, (20090000), vol. 32, pages 157 - 61 |