EP3371659 - CONTACT RESPONSIVE METRONOME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meissner, Konrad 72 Hoyt St. 3 Brooklyn, New York 11201 / US | For all designated states Booth, Edwin 56 Court Street Apt. 7k Brooklyn, New York 11201 / US | For all designated states Glaser, Michael 1901 Callowhill Street 732 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19130 / US | For all designated states Diana, Carla 1901 Callowhill Street 732 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19130 / US | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/18] |
Former [2018/37] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 16862889.9 | 02.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016US60137 | Priority number, date | US201562250367P | 03.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562250367 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017079317 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371659 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371659 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G04F5/00, G04F5/02 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G04F5/025 (EP,US);
G10H1/40 (US);
G10H1/46 (US);
G10H3/146 (US);
G10H2210/076 (US);
G10H2220/185 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTABHÄNGIGES METRONOM | [2018/37] | English: | CONTACT RESPONSIVE METRONOME | [2018/37] | French: | MÉTRONOME SENSIBLE AU CONTACT | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 30.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22163993.3 / EP4075207 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2016 | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | IE | 02.11.2022 | LU | 02.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006117937 (LAWLISS ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * [I] 5,7,11,15; | [XI]US2007089592 (WILSON MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 2,12,13 *[I] 9-11,15 | International search | [YA]US2002062729 (SAGASTEGUI JOHN [US]) [Y] 10 * , para [0033] * [A] 11; | [Y]US2004255756 (NAGAKURA FUMIYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 18* , para [0032] *; | [XYA]US2006117937 (LAWLISS ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 12-17, 19 * , Fig 4; paras [0046], [0063] * [Y] 5, 10, 18 [A] 9, 11, 20; | [Y]US2007089592 (WILSON MARK L [US], et al) [Y] 5 * , Fig 1; para [0035] * |