EP3371227 - CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS TARGETING HER2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | [2021/33] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Priceman, Saul J. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, California 91010 / US | ||
For all designated states Forman, Stephen J. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | |||
For all designated states Brown, Christine E. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRICEMAN, Saul J. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | 02 /
FORMAN, Stephen J. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Christine E. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | [2022/14] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
PRICEMAN, Saul J. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | ||
02 /
FOREMAN, Stephen J. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | |||
03 /
BROWN, Christine E. 1500 E. Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | |||
Former [2018/37] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/08] |
Former [2018/37] | Kunz, Herbert Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16863128.1 | 04.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016US60724 | Priority number, date | US201562251052P | 04.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562251052 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017079694 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3371227 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371227 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3371227 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K14/705, C12N5/10, C12N15/79, C07K14/725, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, A61K35/17, C07K14/71, C07K16/32, C12N5/0783, C12N15/86 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K35/12 (RU);
C07K16/32 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/26 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K35/17 (KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/464406 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P35/04 (CN,KR);
C07K14/70503 (IL,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/70514 (CN,KR);
C07K14/70517 (CN,KR);
C07K14/70521 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/70578 (CN);
C07K14/71 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2863 (CN,IL,US);
C12N15/85 (RU);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/80 (CN);
A61K2039/812 (CN);
A61K2239/17 (KR);
A61K2239/21 (KR);
A61K2239/22 (KR);
A61K2239/31 (KR);
A61K2239/47 (KR);
C07K2317/524 (IL,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/71 (IL,US);
C07K2319/02 (KR);
C07K2319/03 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K2319/74 (CN);
C12N2510/00 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K14/705, C12N5/10, C12N15/79, C07K14/725, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE ANTIGENREZEPTOREN ZUM TARGETING VON HER2 | [2018/37] | English: | CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS TARGETING HER2 | [2018/37] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS ANTIGÉNIQUES CHIMÉRIQUES CIBLANT HER2 | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 04.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.02.2022 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | EP22157943.6 / EP4074731 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2016 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | MT | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | IE | 04.11.2022 | LU | 04.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.11.2022 | ||
LU | 04.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.11.2022 | ||
LU | 04.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.11.2022 | ||
LU | 04.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.11.2022 | ||
LU | 04.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011137245 (ESPERANCE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [XY]US2014099309 (POWELL JR DANIEL J [US], et al); | [XY]US2014140976 (ROSENBLUM MICHAEL G [US], et al); | [XY]WO2014100385 (ANTHROGENESIS CORP [US]); | International search | [Y]US2009252729 (FARRINGTON GRAHAM K [US], et al); | [A]US2011136173 (PLUECKTHUN ANDREAS [CH], et al); | [A]US2011294987 (KANAZAKI KENGO [JP], et al); | [A]US2012301447 (JENSEN MICHAEL C [US]); | [XY]US2014099309 (POWELL JR DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2014140976 (ROSENBLUM MICHAEL G [US], et al); | [X]WO2014100385 (ANTHROGENESIS CORP [US]); | [A]WO2015028444 (UNIVERSITÄT ZU KÖLN [DE]); | [A]US2015306141 (JENSEN MICHAEL C [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2011137245 | US2014099309 | US2014140976 | WO2014100385 |