EP3374789 - INTEGRATED ELECTROMAGNETIC SEEKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Israel Aerospace Industries Ltd. Ben Gurion International Airport 7010000 Lod / IL | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Moshik 8 Pinhas Hagin Street 4975108 Petah Tikva / IL | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16863783.3 | 10.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016IL51213 | Priority number, date | IL20150242588 | 12.11.2015 Original published format: IL 24258815 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017081685 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3374789 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 18.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, F41G7/22, G01S7/03, G01S13/44 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G01S13/44 (EP,US);
G01S13/42 (IL);
F41G7/2246 (EP,US);
F41G7/2286 (EP,US);
F41G7/2293 (US);
G01S3/783 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/38] | G01S13/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER SUCHER | [2018/38] | English: | INTEGRATED ELECTROMAGNETIC SEEKER | [2018/38] | French: | DÉTECTEUR ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE INTÉGRÉ | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 30.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2024 | 20.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9853338 (RAYTHEON TI SYST INC [US]); | [XYI]US7183966 (SCHRAMEK ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]JP2007232306 (TECH RES DEV INST MINI DEFENCE, et al); | [Y]US2012154203 (VACANTI DAVID C [US], et al); | [XYI]US2014209678 (FACTOR RONEN [IL], et al) | International search | [A]US5995062 (DENNEY PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-7* The whole document *; | [A]US2013249772 (INFANTE LEOPOLDO [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * The whole document *; | [A]US2014253368 (HOLDER ERNEST JEFFERSON [US]) [A] 1-7 * The whole document *; | [A]US2015002330 (BINZER THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * The whole document * | by applicant | US7186966 |