EP3374769 - ASSAYS USING AVIDIN AND BIOTIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERETZ, David c/o Bio-Rad Laboratories Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, California 94547 / US | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16864861.6 | 08.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016US60987 | Priority number, date | US201562252993P | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252993 P | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017083302 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3374769 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3374769 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/532, G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/54333 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASSAYS MIT AVIDIN UND BIOTIN | [2018/38] | English: | ASSAYS USING AVIDIN AND BIOTIN | [2018/38] | French: | DOSAGES FAISANT INTERVENIR DE L'AVIDINE ET DE LA BIOTINE | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 21.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2016 | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | BG | 26.10.2022 | CY | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | MK | 26.10.2022 | MT | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | IE | 08.11.2022 | LU | 08.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
BG | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013065249 (TAN WOEI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * par 15, 17, 24, claim 1; *; | [Y] - (TM) Bio-Rad, "Bio-Plex Pro Human Inflammation Assays Instruction Manual", (20141001), URL: http://www.bio-rad.com/webroot/web/pdf/lsr/literature/10044282.pdf, (20190402), XP055576361 [Y] 1-15 * fig 1, page 6; the reminder of the document; * | [Y] - HSU S M ET AL, "A comparative study of the peroxidase-antiperoxidase method and an avidin-biotin complex method for studying polypeptide hormones with radioimmunoassay antibodies.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (198105), Database accession no. NLM6165237, XP002790245 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ajcp/75.5.734 | [ ] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY MAY 1981, (198105), vol. 75, no. 5, ISSN 0002-9173, pages 734 - 738 | International search | [Y]US4684609 (HSU SU-MING [US], et al) [Y] 8 * ; abstract; claim 1 *; | [A]CA2183204 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-3, 4/2-3, 6-9, 18-21 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US6680208 (CAMPOS-GONZALEZ ROBERTO [US], et al) [Y] 7 * ; abstract; claims 25-26 *; | [Y]US2009227044 (DOSEV DOSI [US], et al) [Y] 4/2-3 * ; abstract; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102010000906 (UNIV RUHR BOCHUM [DE]) [A] 1-3, 4/2-3, 6-9, 18-21* ; see English translation; entire document *; | [Y]US2013065249 (TAN WOEI [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/2-3, 6-9, 18-21 * ; figure 3; paragraphs [0015], [0017], [0024]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2014127719 (SHEEHAN ANTONY JAMES [AU], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/2-3, 6-9, 18-21 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0067], [0120], [0130], [0133], [0152], [0371], [0388]-[0392]; claim 59 * | Examination | - HSU SU-MING ET AL, "A Comparative Study of the Peroxidase-antiperoxidase Method and an Avidin-Biotin Complex Method for Studying Polypeptide Hormones with Radioimmunoassay Antibodies", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, CHICAGO : AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, (19810101), vol. 75, no. 5, doi:10.1093/AJCP/75.5.734, ISSN 1943-7722, pages 734 - 738, XP009522703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ajcp/75.5.734 | by applicant | US4115534 | US4141687 | US4684609 | US6684609 | US6773578 | WO2008148883 | US2013065249 | - DIAMANDISCHRISTOPOULOS, Clin. Chem., (19910000), vol. 37, pages 625 - 36 | - HSU et al., J. Histochem. Cytochem., (19810000), vol. 29, pages 577 - 80 | - Am. SOC. Clin. Pathol., vol. 75, no. 5, pages 734 - 738 | - GUESDON et al., J. Histochem. Cytochem., (19790000), vol. 27, pages 1131 - 9 | - VLIEGER et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19920000), vol. 205, pages 1 - 7 | - DUDLEY, Journal of Clinicallmmunoassayl, (19910000), vol. 4, pages 77 - 82 | - SMART, Journal of Clinical Immunoassay, (19920000), vol. 15, pages 246 - 251 | - CARDULLO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 8790 - 8794 | - DEXTER, J. of Chemical Physics, (19530000), vol. 21, pages 836 - 850 | - HOCHSTRASSER et al., Biophysical Chemistry, (19920000), vol. 45, pages 133 - 141 | - SELVIN, Methods in Enzymology, (19950000), vol. 246, pages 300 - 334 | - STEINBERG, Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19710000), vol. 40, pages 83 - 114 | - STRYER, Ann. Rev. Biochem, (19780000), vol. 47, pages 819 - 846 | - WANG et al., Tetrahedron Letters, (19900000), vol. 31, pages 6493 - 6496 | - WANG et al., Anal. Chem., (19950000), vol. 67, pages 1197 - 1203 | - HAN et al., "Quantum-dot-tagged Microbeads for Multiplexed Optical Coding of Biomolecules", Nat Biotechnol, (20010700), vol. 19, doi:10.1038/90228, pages 631 - 635, XP002545495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/90228 | - "Flow Microsphere Immunoassay for the Quantitative and Simultaneous Detection of Multiple Soluble Analytes", MCHUGH, Methods in Cell Biology, Academic Press, (19940000), vol. 42 |