EP3378138 - AN ADJUSTABLE MOUNTING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZETR PTY LTD U 16/5-7 Careel Head Rd Avalon Beach, NSW 2107 / AU | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIOTT, Garth c/o PO Box 1214 Newport Beach, New South Wales 2106 / AU | 02 /
PITTNER, Matthias c/o PO Box 1214 Newport Beach, New South Wales 2106 / AU | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/17] |
Former [2018/39] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16865297.2 | 16.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016AU51098 | Priority number, date | AU20150904713 | 16.11.2015 Original published format: AU 2015904713 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017083913 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3378138 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3378138 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12, H01R13/46, H01R24/76, H02G3/18, H02G3/08, H01R13/74, H01R13/512 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
H02G3/123 (EP,US);
H01R13/512 (US);
H01R13/748 (US);
H02G3/086 (US);
H02G3/18 (US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
H01R24/76 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | H02G3/12, H01R13/46, H01R24/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARE MONTAGEANORDNUNG | [2018/39] | English: | AN ADJUSTABLE MOUNTING ASSEMBLY | [2018/39] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MONTAGE AJUSTABLE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 15.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2023 | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5084596 (BORSH RICHARD J [US], et al); | [XYI]US2011266022 (JAFARI AFSHIN [US]); | [A]US8633384 (SHOTEY MARCUS J [US], et al); | [X]US2014224792 (BENEKE JURGEN K [US]) | International search | [X]US2657250 (WILLIAM WIESMANN JOSEPH); | [X]US4599485 (SMOLIK ROBERT A [US]); | [X]US5289934 (SMITH BENJAMIN H [US], et al); | [X]US8076578 (GRETZ THOMAS J [US]); | [X]US8371465 (DENIER DENNIS J [US]); | [X]US2014224792 (BENEKE JURGEN K [US]) | by applicant | US5084596 | US2011266022 | US8633384 | US2014224792 |