EP3377071 - HUMAN MILK OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR TREATING ANTIBIOTIC ASSOCIATED COMPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/39] | SYNTHETIC COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ANTIBIOTIC ASSOCIATED COMPLICATIONS | ||
[2023/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCONNELL, Bruce 2 Chemin du Crêt à l'Aigle 1814 La Tour de Peilz / CH | 02 /
VIGSNÆS, Louise Kristine Ravneholmsvej 20 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 03 /
KRONLAGE, David Paul 512 Logan Island Court Slidell, LA 70458 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2024/02] |
Former [2018/39] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 16865816.9 | 17.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016DK50371 | Priority number, date | US201562256170P | 17.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256170 P | US201662299186P | 24.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662299186 P | US201662345959P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662345959 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017084673 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377071 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3377071 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/702, A61P1/00 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A23L33/125 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUMANE MILCH-OLIGOSACCHARIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOMPLIKATIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ANTIBIOTIKA | [2023/31] | English: | HUMAN MILK OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR TREATING ANTIBIOTIC ASSOCIATED COMPLICATIONS | [2023/31] | French: | OLIGOSACCHARIDES DE LAIT HUMAIN POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE COMPLICATIONS ASSOCIÉES AUX ANTIBIOTIQUES | [2023/31] |
Former [2018/39] | SYNTHETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOMPLIKATIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ANTIBIOTIKA | ||
Former [2018/39] | SYNTHETIC COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ANTIBIOTIC ASSOCIATED COMPLICATIONS | ||
Former [2018/39] | COMPOSITION SYNTHÉTIQUE PERMETTANT LE TRAITEMENT DE COMPLICATIONS ASSOCIÉES AUX ANTIBIOTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 11.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8197872 (MILLS DAVID A [US], et al); | [YD]WO2013032674 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | [Y]WO2015157098 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | International search | [A]WO2009047537 (FAYREFIELD FOODS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP2388010 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]); | [X]WO2012092160 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | [A]EP2522232 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [X]WO2012158517 (GLYCOSYN LLC [US], et al); | [X]EP2589302 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]); | [X]WO2015095747 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | by applicant | WO0104341 | WO2007101862 | WO2010065652 | WO2010100979 | WO2010115934 | WO2010115935 | WO2011100980 | WO2012113405 | WO2012127410 | WO2012158517 | WO2012155916 | WO2012156897 | WO2012156898 | WO2013032674 | WO2013044928 | WO2013091660 | WO2013139344 | WO2015032412 | WO2015032413 |