EP3379489 - PRINTING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Business Innovation Corp. 9-7-3, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2021/26] |
Former [2018/39] | For all designated states Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO Kensuke c/o Fuji Xerox Co. Ltd. 1 Minatomirai 6-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8668 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2021/42] |
Former [2018/39] | Haseltine Lake LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16865953.0 | 15.04.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016JP62175 | Priority number, date | JP20150225263 | 18.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015225263 | [2018/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017085950 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379489 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379489 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, A61J3/06, G16H20/13 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
A61J3/007 (US);
A61J3/06 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (US);
B41J3/407 (US);
G06T7/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/0002 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | G06T7/00, A61J3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2018/39] | English: | PRINTING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'IMPRESSION | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2018 | Translation filed | 19.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 19.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2016 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | IT | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | IE | 15.04.2022 | LU | 15.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 15.04.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.04.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.04.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.04.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.04.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.04.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 15.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010072745 (ALPVISION S A [CH], et al) [Y] 10,11,13 * paragraphs [0124] , [0 17] *; | [Y]US2013088555 (HANINA ADAM [US], et al) [Y] 10,11,13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] *; | [Y]US2014168309 (MORITA TADAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0067] , [0 85] , [0 86] , [ 121] , [0 58]; figures 1, 24, 16; claim 9 *; | [Y]US2014260104 (ACKLEY E MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 6* paragraphs [0110] , [ 111] *; | [Y]EP2829260 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 14] , [0 98] - [0104] - [0 45]; figures 4, 5, 6b *; | [Y]EP2875802 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 14] , [0 63] , [0 64] , [0 66] , [0 67] , [0 82] , [ 123] , [0 91] , [0 93]; figures 1, 5 * | International search | [A]JP2013121432 (KYOTO SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1-17* , paragraphs [0026] to [0074] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014191361 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-17 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0057]; fig. 3 to 4 & US 2016/0004934 A1 paragraphs [0049] to [0075]; fig. 3 to 4 & WO 2014/156430 A1 * |